Founded in 1925, the Canadian Chamber of Commerce is the nation's largest business association, representing small and large firms from every sector and region in Canada. The Canadian Chamber is a network of 350 community chambers and boards of trade across Canada, in addition to individual corporate members and over 65 trade and professional organizations. The total membership exceeds 170,000. It is dedicated to the promotion and development of a strong economy. The chamber monitors federal and international issues, solicits the views of the Canadian business community and communicates them to policymakers in Ottawa and internationally. Headquartered in Ottawa, it also has staff in Toronto, Montreal and Calgary. www.chamber.ca
Perrin Beatty, President & Chief Executive Officer
Address:
360 Albert Street
Suite 420
Ottawa, ON K1R 7X7
Canada
Telephone number:
613-238-4000
Ext.
245
Fax number:
613-238-7643
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Canadian Chamber of Commerce/La Chambre de commerce du Canada | 2024-05-08 | current |
Canadian Chamber of Commerce/La Chambre de commerce du Canada | 2008-07-14 | 2024-05-08 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Candace Laing | 2024-09-01 | Current |
Perrin Beatty | 2007-09-06 | 2024-09-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Administrative Assistant
National Defence, Canadian Forces Staff School |
June 1986 to August 1986 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Commissioner
Transportation Safety Board Review Commission, Office of the Commissioner |
March 1993 to January 1994 | Not a designated office |
Executive Director
National Transportation Act Review Commission, Office of the Executive Director |
January 1992 to February 1993 | Not a designated office |
Chief of Staff
Solicitor General, Office of the Solicitor General |
April 1991 to February 1993 | Not a designated office |
Chief of Staff
Transport Canada, Office of the Minister |
February 1990 to April 1991 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant
Transport Canada, Office of the Minister of State |
April 1989 to April 1991 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant
International Trade, Office of the Minister |
March 1988 to April 1989 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant
Transport Canada, Office of the Minister |
October 1987 to March 1988 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Finance Canada, Office of the Minister of State (Privatization) |
May 1986 to September 1987 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Treasury Board of Canada, Office of the Minister of State (Regulatory Affairs) |
May 1986 to September 1987 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Status of Women Canada, Office of the Minister |
May 1986 to September 1987 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Forestry and Mines, Office of the Minister of State |
October 1984 to May 1986 | Not a designated office |
Assistant
House of Commons, Office of the Member of Parliament for Prince George |
October 1982 to October 1984 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chair
Private Sector Advisory Board of the Networks of Centres of Excellence, Private Sector Advisory Board of the Networks of Centres of Excellence |
2007 to 2008 | Not a designated office |
Member
Advisory Group on the Branding of the Public Service of Canada, Advisory Group on the Branding of the Public Service of Canada |
2007 to 2008 | Not a designated office |
Member of Committee
The External Advisory Committee on the Office of the Privacy Commissioner, The External Advisory Committee on the Office of the Privacy Commissioner |
2005 to 2008 | Not a designated office |
Member
The Canada Border Services Advisory Committee, The Canada Border Services Advisory Committee |
2005 to April 2008 | Not a designated office |
Member
The Canadian International Development Agency Expert Panel on Partnership programming, The Canadian International Development Agency Expert Panel on Partnership progra |
2005 to 2008 | Not a designated office |
Member
The Advisory Council on national Security, The Advisory Council on national Security |
2005 to 2009 | Not a designated office |
Member
The Canadian International Development Agency Expert Panel on Partnership programming, The Canadian International Development Agency Expert Panel on Partnership progra |
2005 to 2008 | Not a designated office |
President and Chief Executive Officer
Canadian Broadcasting Corporation, Canadian Broadcasting Corporation |
1995 to 1999 | Not a designated office |
Secretary of State for External Affairs
External Affairs, External Affairs |
1993 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Minister
Communications, Communications |
1991 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Minister
Health & Welfare, Health & Welfare |
1989 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
Minister
National Defence, National Defence |
1986 to 1989 | Not a designated office |
Solicitor General of Canada
Solicitor General, Solicitor General |
August 1985 to June 1986 | Not a designated office |
Minister of National Revenue and Minister responsible for Canada Post Corporation
National Revenue, National Revenue |
September 1984 to August 1985 | Not a designated office |
Minister of State
Treasury Board, Treasury Board |
June 1979 to February 1980 | Not a designated office |
Member of Parliament
Government of Canada, House of Commons |
1972 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Constituency Office Manager
Government of Canada, House of Commons |
March 2000 to July 2002 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
Government of Canada, House of Commons |
February 1999 to March 2000 | Not a designated office |
Administrative Assistant
Industry Canada, Secretary of State, Science, Research and Development |
February 1997 to June 1997 | Not a designated office |