Founded in 1925, the Canadian Chamber of Commerce is the nation's largest business association, representing small and large firms from every sector and region in Canada. The Canadian Chamber is a network of 350 community chambers and boards of trade across Canada, in addition to individual corporate members and over 65 trade and professional organizations. The total membership exceeds 170,000. It is dedicated to the promotion and development of a strong economy. The chamber monitors federal and international issues, solicits the views of the Canadian business community and communicates them to policymakers in Ottawa and internationally. Headquartered in Ottawa, it also has staff in Toronto, Montreal and Calgary. www.chamber.ca
Perrin Beatty, President & Chief Executive Officer
Adresse :
360 Albert Street
Suite 420
Ottawa, ON K1R 7X7
Canada
Numéro de téléphone :
613-238-4000
Poste
245
Numéro de fax :
613-238-7643
Ceci est le nom de l'agent responsable tel qu'indiqué dans l'enregistrement le plus récent de l'entreprise ou de l'organisation.
Nom | De | à |
---|---|---|
Canadian Chamber of Commerce/La Chambre de commerce du Canada | 2024-05-08 | actuel |
Canadian Chamber of Commerce/La Chambre de commerce du Canada | 2008-07-14 | 2024-05-08 |
Nom de l'agent responsable | De (aaaa-mm-jj) | À (aaaa-mm-jj) |
---|---|---|
Candace Laing | 2024-09-01 | Actuel |
Perrin Beatty | 2007-09-06 | 2024-09-01 |
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Director
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Business Development Branch |
septembre 2004 à août 2009 | Pas une charge désignée |
Head of Mission
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Canadian Consulate in Dubai |
septembre 2002 à juin 2004 | Pas une charge désignée |
Deputy Director
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, South Asia Relations Division |
août 2001 à août 2002 | Pas une charge désignée |
Executive Assistant to the Deputy Minister
Citizenship and Immigration, Deputy Minister's Office |
septembre 2000 à août 2001 | Pas une charge désignée |
Acting Director
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, US Commercial Relations Division |
août 1998 à août 2000 | Pas une charge désignée |
Deputy Director
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Win Exports Division |
juillet 1995 à juillet 1998 | Pas une charge désignée |
First Secretary
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Commission for Canada, Hong Kong |
août 1992 à juillet 1995 | Pas une charge désignée |
Second Secretary
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Canadian Embassy, Beijing, China |
juillet 1988 à juillet 1992 | Pas une charge désignée |
Trade Policy Analyst, Import Controls Division
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Trade Policy Branch |
septembre 1986 à juillet 1988 | Pas une charge désignée |
Third Secretary
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Canadian High Commission, New Delhi, India |
août 1983 à juillet 1986 | Pas une charge désignée |
Foreign Service Officer in training
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, HR Branch |
août 1982 à août 1983 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Administrative Assistant
National Defence, Canadian Forces Staff School |
juin 1986 à août 1986 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Commissioner
Transportation Safety Board Review Commission, Office of the Commissioner |
mars 1993 à janvier 1994 | Pas une charge désignée |
Executive Director
National Transportation Act Review Commission, Office of the Executive Director |
janvier 1992 à février 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Chief of Staff
Solicitor General, Office of the Solicitor General |
avril 1991 à février 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Chief of Staff
Transport Canada, Office of the Minister |
février 1990 à avril 1991 | Pas une charge désignée |
Executive Assistant
Transport Canada, Office of the Minister of State |
avril 1989 à avril 1991 | Pas une charge désignée |
Executive Assistant
International Trade, Office of the Minister |
mars 1988 à avril 1989 | Pas une charge désignée |
Executive Assistant
Transport Canada, Office of the Minister |
octobre 1987 à mars 1988 | Pas une charge désignée |
Special Assistant
Finance Canada, Office of the Minister of State (Privatization) |
mai 1986 à septembre 1987 | Pas une charge désignée |
Special Assistant
Status of Women Canada, Office of the Minister |
mai 1986 à septembre 1987 | Pas une charge désignée |
Special Assistant
Treasury Board of Canada, Office of the Minister of State (Regulatory Affairs) |
mai 1986 à septembre 1987 | Pas une charge désignée |
Special Assistant
Forestry and Mines, Office of the Minister of State |
octobre 1984 à mai 1986 | Pas une charge désignée |
Assistant
House of Commons, Office of the Member of Parliament for Prince George |
octobre 1982 à octobre 1984 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Member
Advisory Group on the Branding of the Public Service of Canada, Advisory Group on the Branding of the Public Service of Canada |
2007 à 2008 | Pas une charge désignée |
Chair
Private Sector Advisory Board of the Networks of Centres of Excellence, Private Sector Advisory Board of the Networks of Centres of Excellence |
2007 à 2008 | Pas une charge désignée |
Member
The Canada Border Services Advisory Committee, The Canada Border Services Advisory Committee |
2005 à avril 2008 | Pas une charge désignée |
Member
The Canadian International Development Agency Expert Panel on Partnership programming, The Canadian International Development Agency Expert Panel on Partnership progra |
2005 à 2008 | Pas une charge désignée |
Member
The Canadian International Development Agency Expert Panel on Partnership programming, The Canadian International Development Agency Expert Panel on Partnership progra |
2005 à 2008 | Pas une charge désignée |
Member of Committee
The External Advisory Committee on the Office of the Privacy Commissioner, The External Advisory Committee on the Office of the Privacy Commissioner |
2005 à 2008 | Pas une charge désignée |
Member
The Advisory Council on national Security, The Advisory Council on national Security |
2005 à 2009 | Pas une charge désignée |
President and Chief Executive Officer
Canadian Broadcasting Corporation, Canadian Broadcasting Corporation |
1995 à 1999 | Pas une charge désignée |
Secretary of State for External Affairs
External Affairs, External Affairs |
1993 à 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Minister
Communications, Communications |
1991 à 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Minister
Health & Welfare, Health & Welfare |
1989 à 1991 | Pas une charge désignée |
Minister
National Defence, National Defence |
1986 à 1989 | Pas une charge désignée |
Solicitor General of Canada
Solicitor General, Solicitor General |
août 1985 à juin 1986 | Pas une charge désignée |
Minister of National Revenue and Minister responsible for Canada Post Corporation
National Revenue, National Revenue |
septembre 1984 à août 1985 | Pas une charge désignée |
Minister of State
Treasury Board, Treasury Board |
juin 1979 à février 1980 | Pas une charge désignée |
Member of Parliament
Government of Canada, House of Commons |
1972 à 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Director
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Business Development Branch |
septembre 2004 à août 2009 | Pas une charge désignée |
Head of Mission
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Canadian Consulate in Dubai |
septembre 2002 à juin 2004 | Pas une charge désignée |
Deputy Director
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, South Asia Relations Division |
août 2001 à août 2002 | Pas une charge désignée |
Executive Assistant to the Deputy Minister
Citizenship and Immigration, Deputy Minister's Office |
septembre 2000 à août 2001 | Pas une charge désignée |
Acting Director
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, US Commercial Relations Division |
août 1998 à août 2000 | Pas une charge désignée |
Deputy Director
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Win Exports Division |
juillet 1995 à juillet 1998 | Pas une charge désignée |
First Secretary
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Commission for Canada, Hong Kong |
août 1992 à juillet 1995 | Pas une charge désignée |
Second Secretary
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Canadian Embassy, Beijing, China |
juillet 1988 à juillet 1992 | Pas une charge désignée |
Trade Policy Analyst, Import Controls Division
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Trade Policy Branch |
septembre 1986 à juillet 1988 | Pas une charge désignée |
Third Secretary
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Canadian High Commission, New Delhi, India |
août 1983 à juillet 1986 | Pas une charge désignée |
Foreign Service Officer in training
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, HR Branch |
août 1982 à août 1983 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Constituency Office Manager
Government of Canada, House of Commons |
mars 2000 à juillet 2002 | Pas une charge désignée |
Legislative Assistant
Government of Canada, House of Commons |
février 1999 à mars 2000 | Pas une charge désignée |
Administrative Assistant
Industry Canada, Secretary of State, Science, Research and Development |
février 1997 à juin 1997 | Pas une charge désignée |