Founded in 1925, the Canadian Chamber of Commerce is the nation's largest business association, representing small and large firms from every sector and region in Canada. The Canadian Chamber is a network of 420 community chambers and boards of trade across Canada, in addition to individual corporate members and over 80 trade and professional organizations. The total membership exceeds 192,000. It is dedicated to the promotion and development of a strong economy. The chamber monitors federal and international issues, solicits the views of the Canadian business community and communicates them to policymakers in Ottawa and internationally. Headquartered in Ottawa, it also has staff in Toronto, Montreal and Calgary. www.chamber.ca
Perrin Beatty, President & Chief Executive Officer
Date de la fin du dernier exercice financier complet : 2011-12-31
Institution gouvernementale | Financement reçu au cours du dernier exercice financier | Financement attendu pendant l'exercice financier en cours |
---|---|---|
Ressources humaines et Développement des compétences Canada (RHDCC) | 0,00 $ | Oui |
Adresse :
360 Albert Street
Suite 420
Ottawa, ON K1R 7X7
Canada
Numéro de téléphone :
613-238-4000
Poste
245
Numéro de fax :
613-238-7643
Ceci est le nom de l'agent responsable tel qu'indiqué dans l'enregistrement le plus récent de l'entreprise ou de l'organisation.
Nom | De | à |
---|---|---|
Canadian Chamber of Commerce/La Chambre de commerce du Canada | 2024-05-08 | actuel |
Canadian Chamber of Commerce/La Chambre de commerce du Canada | 2008-07-14 | 2024-05-08 |
Nom de l'agent responsable | De (aaaa-mm-jj) | À (aaaa-mm-jj) |
---|---|---|
Candace Laing | 2024-09-01 | Actuel |
Perrin Beatty | 2007-09-06 | 2024-09-01 |
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Commissioner
Transportation Safety Board Review Commission, Office of the Commissioner |
mars 1993 à janvier 1994 | Pas une charge désignée |
Executive Director
National Transportation Act Review Commission, Office of the Executive Director |
janvier 1992 à février 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Chief of Staff
Solicitor General, Office of the Solicitor General |
avril 1991 à février 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Chief of Staff
Transport Canada, Office of the Minister |
février 1990 à avril 1991 | Pas une charge désignée |
Executive Assistant
Transport Canada, Office of the Minister of State |
avril 1989 à avril 1991 | Pas une charge désignée |
Executive Assistant
International Trade, Office of the Minister |
mars 1988 à avril 1989 | Pas une charge désignée |
Executive Assistant
Transport Canada, Office of the Minister |
octobre 1987 à mars 1988 | Pas une charge désignée |
Special Assistant
Finance Canada, Office of the Minister of State (Privatization) |
mai 1986 à septembre 1987 | Pas une charge désignée |
Special Assistant
Treasury Board of Canada, Office of the Minister of State (Regulatory Affairs) |
mai 1986 à septembre 1987 | Pas une charge désignée |
Special Assistant
Status of Women Canada, Office of the Minister |
mai 1986 à septembre 1987 | Pas une charge désignée |
Special Assistant
Forestry and Mines, Office of the Minister of State |
octobre 1984 à mai 1986 | Pas une charge désignée |
Assistant
House of Commons, Office of the Member of Parliament for Prince George |
octobre 1982 à octobre 1984 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Chair
Private Sector Advisory Board of the Networks of Centres of Excellence, Private Sector Advisory Board of the Networks of Centres of Excellence |
2007 à 2008 | Pas une charge désignée |
Member
Advisory Group on the Branding of the Public Service of Canada, Advisory Group on the Branding of the Public Service of Canada |
2007 à 2008 | Pas une charge désignée |
Member
The Canada Border Services Advisory Committee, The Canada Border Services Advisory Committee |
2005 à avril 2008 | Pas une charge désignée |
Member
The Advisory Council on national Security, The Advisory Council on national Security |
2005 à 2009 | Pas une charge désignée |
Member
The Canadian International Development Agency Expert Panel on Partnership programming, The Canadian International Development Agency Expert Panel on Partnership progra |
2005 à 2008 | Pas une charge désignée |
Member of Committee
The External Advisory Committee on the Office of the Privacy Commissioner, The External Advisory Committee on the Office of the Privacy Commissioner |
2005 à 2008 | Pas une charge désignée |
Member
The Canadian International Development Agency Expert Panel on Partnership programming, The Canadian International Development Agency Expert Panel on Partnership progra |
2005 à 2008 | Pas une charge désignée |
President and Chief Executive Officer
Canadian Broadcasting Corporation, Canadian Broadcasting Corporation |
1995 à 1999 | Pas une charge désignée |
Secretary of State for External Affairs
External Affairs, External Affairs |
1993 à 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Minister
Communications, Communications |
1991 à 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Minister
Health & Welfare, Health & Welfare |
1989 à 1991 | Pas une charge désignée |
Minister
National Defence, National Defence |
1986 à 1989 | Pas une charge désignée |
Solicitor General of Canada
Solicitor General, Solicitor General |
août 1985 à juin 1986 | Pas une charge désignée |
Minister of National Revenue and Minister responsible for Canada Post Corporation
National Revenue, National Revenue |
septembre 1984 à août 1985 | Pas une charge désignée |
Minister of State
Treasury Board, Treasury Board |
juin 1979 à février 1980 | Pas une charge désignée |
Member of Parliament
Government of Canada, House of Commons |
1972 à 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Senior Policy Analyst (EC-06)
Natural Resources Canada, Science Policy Integration Sector, Science Evidence and Analysis Branch |
avril 2009 à février 2012 | Pas une charge désignée |
Policy Analyst
Natural Resources Canada, Energy Sector, Renewable Energy and Electricity Division |
avril 2008 à avril 2009 | Pas une charge désignée |