Founded in 1925, the Canadian Chamber of Commerce is the nation's largest business association, representing small and large firms from every sector and region in Canada. The Canadian Chamber is a network of 420 community chambers and boards of trade across Canada, in addition to individual corporate members and over 80 trade and professional organizations. The total membership exceeds 192,000. It is dedicated to the promotion and development of a strong economy. The chamber monitors federal and international issues, solicits the views of the Canadian business community and communicates them to policymakers in Ottawa and internationally. Headquartered in Ottawa, it also has staff in Toronto, Montreal and Calgary. www.chamber.ca
Perrin Beatty, President & Chief Executive Officer
Date de la fin du dernier exercice financier complet : 2022-12-31
Institution gouvernementale | Financement reçu au cours du dernier exercice financier | Financement attendu pendant l'exercice financier en cours |
---|---|---|
Administration portuaire de Montréal | 50 000,00 $ | Oui |
Administration portuaire Vancouver Fraser (Port Metro Vancouver) | 60 000,00 $ | Oui |
Banque de développement du Canada (BDC) | 58 000,00 $ | Oui |
Banque de l'infrastructure du Canada | 5 000,00 $ | Non |
Canada Employment Insurance Commission | 2 800,00 $ | Non |
Emploi et Développement social Canada (EDSC) | 44 275,00 $ | Oui |
Exportation et développement Canada (EDC) | 70 000,00 $ | Oui |
Innovation, Sciences et Développement économique Canada (ISDE) | 1 492 339,43 $ | Oui |
Office d'investissement du régime de pensions du Canada | 20 000,00 $ | Non |
Office of the Taxpayer’s Ombudsperson | 2 800,00 $ | Oui |
Société canadienne des postes (SCP) | 20 000,00 $ | Non |
Adresse :
275 Slater Street
Floor 17
Ottawa, ON K1P 5H9
Canada
Numéro de téléphone :
613-238-4000
Poste
2245
Numéro de fax :
613-238-7643
Ceci est le nom de l'agent responsable tel qu'indiqué dans l'enregistrement le plus récent de l'entreprise ou de l'organisation.
Nom | De | à |
---|---|---|
Canadian Chamber of Commerce/La Chambre de commerce du Canada | 2024-05-08 | actuel |
Canadian Chamber of Commerce/La Chambre de commerce du Canada | 2008-07-14 | 2024-05-08 |
Nom de l'agent responsable | De (aaaa-mm-jj) | À (aaaa-mm-jj) |
---|---|---|
Candace Laing | 2024-09-01 | Actuel |
Perrin Beatty | 2007-09-06 | 2024-09-01 |
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Communications Advisor
House of Commons Administration, Office of the Clerk |
mars 2010 à novembre 2013 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Acting Chief of Staff
House of Commons, Office of MP Garnett Genuis |
septembre 2021 à octobre 2021 | Pas une charge désignée |
Executive Assistant
House of Commons, Office of MP Garnett Genuis |
août 2020 à septembre 2021 | Pas une charge désignée |
Parliamentary Assistant
House of Commons, Office of MP Garnett Genuis |
novembre 2019 à août 2020 | Pas une charge désignée |
Intern
Senate of Canada, Office of Senator Marilou McPhedran |
mai 2018 à juin 2018 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Research Analyst
Department of National Defence, Defence Research and Development Canada (DRDC) |
mai 2021 à avril 2022 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Special Advisor
Senate of Canada, Office of the Usher of the Black Rod |
novembre 2019 à mai 2021 | Pas une charge désignée |
Special Assistant
Senate of Canada, Office of Senator Wanda Thomas Bernard |
août 2018 à octobre 2018 | Pas une charge désignée |
Special Assistant
Senate of Canada, Office of the Usher of the Black Rod |
novembre 2015 à septembre 2017 | Pas une charge désignée |
Administrative Assistant
House of Commons, House of Commons |
septembre 2014 à octobre 2015 | Pas une charge désignée |
Page
House of Commons, House of Commons |
août 2013 à août 2014 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Chief of Staff
Office of the Minister of State (Sport), Canadian Heritage |
juin 2014 à novembre 2015 | novembre 15, 2015 |
Director of Policy
Office of the Minister of State (Sport), Canadian Heritage |
juin 2011 à juin 2014 | juin 14, 2014 |
Policy Advisor
Office of the Minister of International Cooperation, Canadian International Development Agency |
octobre 2009 à juin 2011 | juin 19, 2011 |
Policy Advisor
Office of the Minister of State (Foreign Affairs)(Americas), Department of Foreign Affairs |
novembre 2008 à octobre 2009 | octobre 12, 2009 |
Policy Advisor
Office of the Minister of Transportation, Infrastructure and Communities, Department of Transportation |
juin 2008 à novembre 2008 | novembre 4, 2008 |
Special Assistant (Policy)
Minister’s Office – Office of Secretary of State (Foreign Affairs and International Trade)(Sport), Dept. of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Dept. of Canadian Heritage |
janvier 2008 à juin 2008 | Pas une charge désignée |
Operations Assistant
Conservative Resource Group, House of Commons |
mai 2007 à octobre 2007 | Pas une charge désignée |
Student
Office of the Hon. David Emerson, Member of Parliament for Vancouver--Kingsway, House of Commons |
février 2006 à mai 2007 | Pas une charge désignée |
Student Intern
Office of David Tilson, Member of Parliament for Dufferin--Caledon, House of Commons |
juin 2004 à août 2004 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Deputy Chief of Staff and Director of Parliamentary Affairs
Agriculture and Agrifood Canada, Office of the Minister |
juin 2004 à août 2005 | Pas une charge désignée |
Deputy Chief of Staff and Directory of Parliamentary Affairs
Indian Affairs and Northern Development, Office of the Minister |
décembre 2003 à juin 2004 | Pas une charge désignée |
Executive Assistant
Office of the Secretary of State (Rural Development) (FedNor), Office of the Secretary of State |
juillet 2001 à décembre 2003 | Pas une charge désignée |
Special Assistant
Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Office of the Minister for International Trade |
décembre 1995 à janvier 1997 | Pas une charge désignée |
Special Assistant
Treasury Board Secretariat, Office of the President |
décembre 1993 à décembre 1995 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Deputy Chief Economist
Export Development Canada, Economics |
septembre 2017 à juin 2021 | Pas une charge désignée |
Senior Economist
Office of the Parliamentary Budget Officer, Economic and Fiscal Analysis |
août 2008 à janvier 2013 | Pas une charge désignée |
Researcher
Finance Canada, Economic Studies and Policy Analysis Division |
juin 2004 à août 2004 | Pas une charge désignée |
Economist
Bank of Canada, Research Department |
octobre 2001 à août 2003 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Member
Advisory Group on the Branding of the Public Service of Canada, Advisory Group on the Branding of the Public Service of Canada |
2007 à 2008 | Pas une charge désignée |
Chair
Private Sector Advisory Board of the Networks of Centres of Excellence, Private Sector Advisory Board of the Networks of Centres of Excellence |
2007 à 2008 | Pas une charge désignée |
Member
The Canadian International Development Agency Expert Panel on Partnership programming, The Canadian International Development Agency Expert Panel on Partnership progra |
2005 à 2008 | Pas une charge désignée |
Member
The Advisory Council on national Security, The Advisory Council on national Security |
2005 à 2009 | Pas une charge désignée |
Member
The Canada Border Services Advisory Committee, The Canada Border Services Advisory Committee |
2005 à avril 2008 | Pas une charge désignée |
Member
The Canadian International Development Agency Expert Panel on Partnership programming, The Canadian International Development Agency Expert Panel on Partnership progra |
2005 à 2008 | Pas une charge désignée |
Member of Committee
The External Advisory Committee on the Office of the Privacy Commissioner, The External Advisory Committee on the Office of the Privacy Commissioner |
2005 à 2008 | Pas une charge désignée |
President and Chief Executive Officer
Canadian Broadcasting Corporation, Canadian Broadcasting Corporation |
1995 à 1999 | Pas une charge désignée |
Secretary of State for External Affairs
External Affairs, External Affairs |
1993 à 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Minister
Communications, Communications |
1991 à 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Minister
Health & Welfare, Health & Welfare |
1989 à 1991 | Pas une charge désignée |
Minister
National Defence, National Defence |
1986 à 1989 | Pas une charge désignée |
Solicitor General of Canada
Solicitor General, Solicitor General |
août 1985 à juin 1986 | Pas une charge désignée |
Minister of National Revenue and Minister responsible for Canada Post Corporation
National Revenue, National Revenue |
septembre 1984 à août 1985 | Pas une charge désignée |
Minister of State
Treasury Board, Treasury Board |
juin 1979 à février 1980 | Pas une charge désignée |
Member of Parliament
Government of Canada, House of Commons |
1972 à 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Policy Analyst
Human Resources Development Canada, Social Policy, Strategic Policy |
janvier 2001 à août 2003 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Parliamentary Intern
House of Commons, Office of the Assistant Deputy Speaker & Deputy Chair of Committees of the Whole |
mai 2022 à juin 2022 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Administrative Assistant
Canadian Air Transport Security Authority, Corporate Services |
novembre 2010 à mars 2016 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant
Parliament of Canada, House of Commons |
avril 2004 à septembre 2004 | Pas une charge désignée |