ALLIANCE OF MANUFACTURERS & EXPORTERS CANADA OPERATING AS CANADIAN MANUFACTURERS & EXPORTERS (CME) IS A NATIONAL ASSOCIATION REPRESENTING THE INTERESTS OF CANADIAN MANUFACTURERS & EXPORTERS. CME IS CANADA'S LEADING BUSINESS NETWORK COMMITTED TO STRENGTHENING THE COMPETITIVENESS OF CANADIAN INDUSTRY AND ENABLING THE SUCCESS OF CANADIAN BUSINESSES IN WORLD MARKETS BY AGRESSIVELY AND EFFECTIVELY INFLUENCING GOVERNMENT THINKING AND ACTION AND BY DELIVERING TIMELY, RELEVANT INFORMATION AND SUPPORT OF SUPERIOR QUALITY AND VALUE
Dennis Darby, President & CEO
End date of the last completed financial year: 2023-03-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Atlantic Canada Opportunities Agency (ACOA) | $397,000.00 | Yes |
Federal Economic Development Agency for Southern Ontario (FedDev) | $190,000.00 | Yes |
Address:
67 Yonge Street
Suite 1400
Toronto, ON M5E 1J8
Canada
Telephone number:
905-672-3466
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Alliance of Manufacturers & Exporters Canada (CME)/Alliance des manufacturiers et des exportateurs du Canada (MEC) | 2024-04-15 | current |
Alliance of Manufacturers & Exporters Canada (CME)/Alliance des manufacturiers et des exportateurs du Canada (MEC) | 2008-08-15 | 2024-04-15 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Dennis Darby | 2017-01-30 | Current |
Mathew Wilson | 2016-10-01 | 2017-01-30 |
Jayson Myers | 2007-08-23 | 2016-10-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Member Assistant
House of Commons, MP James Cumming's Office |
June 2020 to June 2021 | June 15, 2021 |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Operation
Public Safety Canada, Office of the Minister of Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness |
March 2015 to May 2015 | May 14, 2015 |
Senior Policy Advisor
Public Safety Canada, Office of the Minister of Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness |
August 2013 to March 2015 | March 27, 2015 |
Policy Advisor
Industry Canada - now Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada (ISED), Office of the Minister of Industry and Minister of State (Agriculture) |
May 2012 to July 2013 | July 15, 2013 |
Policy Advisor and Caucus Liaison
Atlantic Canada Opportunities Agency (ACOA), Office of the Minister of State (Atlantic Canada Opportunities Agency) (La Franc |
June 2011 to May 2012 | May 3, 2012 |
Special Assistant, Policy and Communication
Veterans Affairs Canada, Office of the Minister of Veterans Affairs and Minister of State (Agriculture) |
October 2010 to May 2011 | May 18, 2011 |
Communications Coordinator
Canadian Heritage, Office of the Minister of Canadian Heritage and Official Languages |
January 2009 to August 2009 | August 21, 2009 |
Executive Assistant
Canadian Heritage, Office of the Minister of Canadian Heritage and Official Languages |
October 2008 to December 2008 | December 31, 2008 |
Special Assistant
Canadian Heritage, Office of the Secretary of State,Official Languages,Asia-Pacific Gateway& Olympi |
August 2008 to October 2008 | October 30, 2008 |
Communications Coordinator
Transport Canada, Office of the Minister of Transport, Infrastructure and Communities |
March 2008 to August 2008 | August 15, 2008 |
Communications Assistant
Parliament of Canada (Constituency Office), Member of Parliament for Pontiac |
May 2007 to March 2008 | Not a designated office |
Communications Intern
Transport Canada, Office of the Minister of Transport, Infrastructure and Communities |
May 2006 to August 2006 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Member Assistant
House of Commons, MP James Cumming's Office |
June 2020 to June 2021 | June 15, 2021 |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Policy Advisor
Public Works and Government Services, Office of the Minister of Public Works and Government Services Canada |
July 2013 to August 2015 | August 24, 2015 |
Senior Policy Advisor
Human Resources and Skills Development, Office of the Minister of Human Resources and Skills Development |
June 2011 to July 2013 | July 26, 2013 |
Senior Policy Advisor
Industry, Office of the Minister of Small Business and Tourism |
January 2009 to May 2011 | May 20, 2011 |
Executive Assistant
Transport, Office of the Minister of Transport, Infrastructure and Communities |
October 2008 to January 2009 | January 23, 2009 |
Executive Assistant
Prime Minister of Canada, Office of the Prime Minister |
September 2006 to July 2008 | July 11, 2008 |