The Canadian Parks and Wilderness Society (CPAWS) envisages a healthy ecosphere where people experience and respect natural ecosystems. We will achieve this by: * protecting Canada's wild ecosystems in parks, wilderness and similar natural areas, preserving the full diversity of habitats and their species; * promoting awareness and understanding of ecological principles and the inherent values of wilderness through education, appreciation and experience; * encouraging individual action to accomplish these goals; * working co-operatively with government, First Nations, business, other organizations and individuals in a consensus-seeking manner, wherever possible. CPAWS believes that by ensuring the health of the parts, we ensure the health of the whole, which is our health too.
Sandra Schwartz, National Executive Director
End date of the last completed financial year: 2020-03-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Canada Summer Jobs | $22,716.00 | Yes |
Canada Summer Jobs | $29,735.00 | Yes |
Canadian Heritage (PCH) | $3,527.30 | No |
Employment and Social Development Canada (ESDC) | $43,415.72 | Yes |
Employment and Social Development Canada (ESDC) | $437,181.02 | Yes |
Environment and Climate Change Canada (ECCC) | $654,048.78 | Yes |
Fisheries and Oceans Canada (DFO) | $968,242.00 | Yes |
Government of Manitoba | $940.85 | No |
New Brunswick Department of Natural Resources | $30,000.00 | No |
New Brunswick Environmental Trust Fund | $34,772.21 | No |
Newfoundland Provincial Government | $2,500.00 | No |
One Job Pledge Government of New Brunswick | $20,100.00 | No |
Student Employment Experience Development New Brunswick | $5,380.20 | No |
Address:
100 Gloucester Street, suite 600
Ottawa, ON K2P 0A4
Canada
Telephone number:
613-569-7226
Ext.
235
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Canadian Parks and Wilderness Society/Société pour la nature et les parcs du Canada | 2024-04-01 | current |
Canadian Parks and Wilderness Society/Société pour la nature et les parcs du Canada | 2009-03-01 | 2024-04-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Sandra Schwartz | 2019-09-03 | Current |
Alison Ronson | 2018-12-18 | 2019-09-03 |
Éric Hébert-Daly | 2009-04-20 | 2018-12-18 |
Ellen Adelberg | 2009-03-01 | 2009-04-20 |
Anne Lévesque | 2008-01-08 | 2009-06-02 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Chief of Staff
House of Commons, Tom Mulcair, Leader of the NDP |
novembre 2015 à janvier 2016 | Pas une charge désignée |
Deputy Chief of Staff
House of Commons, Official of the Leader of the Official Opposition |
mars 2012 à octobre 2015 | Pas une charge désignée |
Chief of Staff
House of Commons, Office of the House Leader of the Official Opposition |
août 2011 à mars 2012 | Pas une charge désignée |
Deputy Director, Research and Policy
House of Commons, Jack Layton, Leader of the NDP |
janvier 2009 à août 2011 | Pas une charge désignée |
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Tom Mulcair, Member of Parliament |
octobre 2007 à décembre 2008 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Chief of Staff
House of Commons, Tom Mulcair, Leader of the NDP |
novembre 2015 à janvier 2016 | Pas une charge désignée |
Deputy Chief of Staff
House of Commons, Official of the Leader of the Official Opposition |
mars 2012 à octobre 2015 | Pas une charge désignée |
Chief of Staff
House of Commons, Office of the House Leader of the Official Opposition |
août 2011 à mars 2012 | Pas une charge désignée |
Deputy Director, Research and Policy
House of Commons, Jack Layton, Leader of the NDP |
janvier 2009 à août 2011 | Pas une charge désignée |
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Tom Mulcair, Member of Parliament |
octobre 2007 à décembre 2008 | Pas une charge désignée |