THE AEROSPACE INDUSTRIES ASSOCIATION OF CANADA (AIAC) IS AN INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION REPRESENTING IN EXCESS OF 400 LARGE, MEDIUM AND SMALL CANADIAN ENTERPRISES THAT GENERATED MORE THAN 82,000 HIGH TECH JOBS AND REVENUES IN EXCESS OF $22BILLION IN 2007. THE ASSOCIATION IS THE VOICE OF CANADA'S AEROSPACE INDUSTRY. AIAC ON BEHALF OF ITS MEMBERS UNDERTAKES ADVOCACY, EXPORT PROMOTION AND EVENT PLANNING ACTIVITIES.
James Quick, PRESIDENT & CHIEF EXECUTIVE OFFICER
End date of the last completed financial year: 2020-08-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
BC Government - Jobs, Trade and Technology | $54,946.00 | Yes |
Canadian Commercial Corporation (CCC) | $5,735.00 | Yes |
Canadian Space Agency | $565.00 | Yes |
Canadian Trade Commissioner Service -Global Opportunities for Associations (GOA) | $232,996.00 | Yes |
Finance (CRA) - Wage Subsidies | $179,617.00 | Yes |
Global Affairs Canada (GAC) | $1,885.00 | Yes |
Government of Canada -FedDev Ontario | $975.00 | Yes |
Government of Saskatchewan | $1,200.00 | Yes |
Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada (ISED) | $40,271.00 | Yes |
National Defence (DND) | $2,275.00 | Yes |
National Research Council (NRC) | $3,030.00 | Yes |
Public Services and Procurement Canada (PSPC) | $1,713.00 | Yes |
Western Economic Diversification Canada (WD) | $73,506.00 | Yes |
Address:
255 Albert Street
Suite 703
OTTAWA, ON k1p 6a9
Canada
Telephone number:
613-232-4297
Fax number:
613-232-1142
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Aerospace Industries Association of Canada/Association des Industries Aérospatiales du Canada | 2024-05-02 | current |
Aerospace Industries Association of Canada/Association des Industries Aérospatiales du Canada | 2008-12-11 | 2024-05-02 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Michael Mueller | 2021-02-01 | Current |
James Quick | 2011-06-23 | 2021-02-01 |
CLAUDE LAJEUNESSE | 2008-01-17 | 2011-06-23 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chief of Staff
Employment and Social Development Canada, Minister Office |
July 2013 to November 2015 | November 4, 2015 |
Director of Parliamentary Affairs and Stakeholder Relations
Public Safety Canada, Minister Office |
February 2012 to July 2013 | July 9, 2013 |
Director of Parliamentary Affairs and Issues Management
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Minister Office |
May 2011 to February 2012 | February 24, 2012 |
Director of Parliamentary Affairs
Treasury Board Secretariat, Minister Office |
November 2010 to May 2011 | May 18, 2011 |
Issues Manager/Policy Advisor
Public Safety Canada, Minister Office |
January 2010 to November 2010 | November 19, 2010 |
Assistant to the Parliamentary Secretary
Treasury Board Secretariat, Minister Office |
November 2008 to January 2010 | January 19, 2010 |
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Members Office |
August 2007 to November 2008 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Member - Advisory Council
Aerospace Review, N/A |
February 2012 to December 2012 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
External Affairs, Minister's Office |
1995 to November 1995 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Communications, Minister's Office |
1993 to 1995 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Federal Provincial Relations Office, Constitutional Affairs |
1990 to 1990 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Industry Canada, Minister's Office |
November 1989 to 1990 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chief of Staff
Employment and Social Development Canada, Minister Office |
July 2013 to November 2015 | November 4, 2015 |
Director of Parliamentary Affairs and Stakeholder Relations
Public Safety Canada, Minister Office |
February 2012 to July 2013 | July 9, 2013 |
Director of Parliamentary Affairs and Issues Management
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Minister Office |
May 2011 to February 2012 | February 24, 2012 |
Director of Parliamentary Affairs
Treasury Board Secretariat, Minister Office |
November 2010 to May 2011 | May 18, 2011 |
Issues Manager/Policy Advisor
Public Safety Canada, Minister Office |
January 2010 to November 2010 | November 19, 2010 |
Assistant to the Parliamentary Secretary
Treasury Board Secretariat, Minister Office |
November 2008 to January 2010 | January 19, 2010 |
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Members Office |
August 2007 to November 2008 | Not a designated office |