The Canola Council of Canada is a national, nonprofit association funded by stakeholders in the canola industry. Our mission is to enhance the industry's ability to profitably produce and supply seed, oil and meal products that offer superior value to customers throughout the world. Members include canola growers, crop input suppliers, grain handling companies, exporters, processors and food and feed manufacturers.
JIM EVERSON, President
End date of the last completed financial year: 2016-12-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada (AAFC) | $4,332,572.00 | Yes |
Province of Manitoba - Agri-Food Research and Development Initiative | $4,357.00 | Yes |
Address:
400-167 Lombard Avenue
Winnipeg, MB R3B 0T6
Canada
Telephone number:
613-488-9916
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Canola Council of Canada | 2024-04-08 | current |
Canola Council of Canada | 2008-11-03 | 2024-04-08 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Chris Davison | 2023-07-31 | Current |
JIM EVERSON | 2017-05-23 | 2023-07-31 |
Brian Innes | 2017-02-10 | 2017-05-23 |
Patti Miller | 2012-05-03 | 2017-02-10 |
Cory McArthur | 2012-01-09 | 2012-05-03 |
JoAnne Buth | 2008-01-23 | 2012-01-09 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chief of Staff
Agriculture Canada, Office of Minister of Canadian Wheat Board |
1987 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Department of Communications, Minister's office |
1986 to 1987 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Agriculture Canada, Minister's office |
1984 to 1986 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Agriculture Counsellor
International Trade and Market Devleopment Division, Embassy of Canada, Beijing |
August 2011 to March 2015 | Not a designated office |
Senior Trade Policy Analyst
Market Access Secretariat, Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada |
September 2008 to August 2011 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Research Scientist, Cropping Systems Pathologist
Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada, Research Branch |
January 1997 to May 1997 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Parliamentary Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Leon Benoit, Member of Parliament for Vegreville-Wainwright |
June 2014 to December 2014 | Not a designated office |
Parliamentary Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Chungsen Leung, Member of Parliament for Willowdale |
March 2014 to December 2014 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student (Intern)
Office of the Minister of State for Finance, Office of the Minister of State for Finance |
April 2012 to August 2012 | August 24, 2012 |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chief of Staff
Agriculture Canada, Office of Minister of Canadian Wheat Board |
1987 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Department of Communications, Minister's office |
1986 to 1987 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Agriculture Canada, Minister's office |
1984 to 1986 | Not a designated office |