The Canola Council of Canada is a national, nonprofit association funded by stakeholders in the canola industry. Our mission is to enhance the industry's ability to profitably produce and supply seed, oil and meal products that offer superior value to customers throughout the world. Members include canola growers, crop input suppliers, grain handling companies, exporters, processors and food and feed manufacturers.
Patti Miller, President
End date of the last completed financial year: 2011-12-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada (AAFC) | $8,049,325.00 | Yes |
Address:
400-167 Lombard Avenue
Winnipeg, MB R3B 0T6
Canada
Telephone number:
204-982-2109
Fax number:
204-942-1841
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Canola Council of Canada | 2024-04-08 | current |
Canola Council of Canada | 2008-11-03 | 2024-04-08 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Chris Davison | 2023-07-31 | Current |
JIM EVERSON | 2017-05-23 | 2023-07-31 |
Brian Innes | 2017-02-10 | 2017-05-23 |
Patti Miller | 2012-05-03 | 2017-02-10 |
Cory McArthur | 2012-01-09 | 2012-05-03 |
JoAnne Buth | 2008-01-23 | 2012-01-09 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Executive Director Operations, Acting Director General (A/EX03), Director General
Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada, Farm Income Programs Division |
September 2008 to April 2012 | Not a designated office |
Acting Executive Director, Grains and Oilseeds Market Analysis
Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada, Strategic Policy Branch |
October 2007 to September 2008 | Not a designated office |
Director, Grains and Oilseeds and Agrifood Industry Emergency Preparedness
Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada, Strategic Policy Branch |
July 2006 to October 2007 | Not a designated office |
Acting Director, Horticulture and Special Crops
Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada, Market and Industry Services Branch |
November 2005 to April 2006 | Not a designated office |
Assistant Director, Special Crops
Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada, Market and Industry Services Branch |
April 2005 to July 2006 | Not a designated office |
Assistant Director, New Foods and Technologies
Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada, Market and Industry Services Branch |
March 2002 to March 2005 | Not a designated office |
Senior Market Development Officer
Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada, Market and Industry Services Branch |
September 2001 to March 2002 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Executive Director Operations, Acting Director General (A/EX03), Director General
Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada, Farm Income Programs Division |
September 2008 to April 2012 | Not a designated office |
Acting Executive Director, Grains and Oilseeds Market Analysis
Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada, Strategic Policy Branch |
October 2007 to September 2008 | Not a designated office |
Director, Grains and Oilseeds and Agrifood Industry Emergency Preparedness
Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada, Strategic Policy Branch |
July 2006 to October 2007 | Not a designated office |
Acting Director, Horticulture and Special Crops
Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada, Market and Industry Services Branch |
November 2005 to April 2006 | Not a designated office |
Assistant Director, Special Crops
Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada, Market and Industry Services Branch |
April 2005 to July 2006 | Not a designated office |
Assistant Director, New Foods and Technologies
Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada, Market and Industry Services Branch |
March 2002 to March 2005 | Not a designated office |
Senior Market Development Officer
Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada, Market and Industry Services Branch |
September 2001 to March 2002 | Not a designated office |