INSURANCE BUREAU OF CANADA (IBC) IS THE NATIONAL "UMBRELLA" TRADE ASSOCIATION FOR PRIVATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY (P & C) INSURERS IN CANADA. IBC WAS FORMED IN OCTOBER 1997 FROM THE RESTRUCTURING OF INSURANCE BUREAU OF CANADA ( IBC) AND INSURANCE CRIME PREVENTION BUREAU OF CANADA ( ICPB). ON APRIL 30, 1998 ASSOCIATION OF CANADIAN INSURERS ("ACI") RESOLVED TO MERGE WITH IBC. IBC HAS FIVE OPERATING DIVISIONS: POLICY DEVELOPMENT DIVISION (WHICH IS INVOLVED WITH POLICY DEVELOPMENT AND GOVERNMENT RELATIONS) ISD DIVISION (WHICH IS INVOLVED WITH THE PREVENTION, DETECTION AND INVESTIGATION OF INSURANCE CRIME AND FRAUD) ACI DIVISION (WHICH REPRESENTS THE INTERESTS OF CANADIAN INSURERS), CORPORATE SERVICES DIVISION (WHICH PROVIDES LEGAL SERVICES AND PUBLIC AFFAIRS SERVICES TO THE OTHER DIVISIONS); AND IID WHICH COLLECTS, COLLATES AND ANALYZES ACTUARIAL, STATISTICAL AND OTHER INFORMATION RELEVANT TO THE FIELD OF GENERAL INSURANCE AND CONCERNING VEHICLES AND VEHICLE PARTS. IBC IS THE OFFICIAL VOICE OF P & C INSURANCE COMPANIES IN CANADA AND WORKS WITH ITS MEMBERS TO SHAPE PUBLIC POLICY AT NATIONAL AND PROVINCIAL LEVELS. IBC HAS ITS HEAD OFFICE IN TORONTO, REGIONAL OFFICES IN HALIFAX, MONTREAL, OTTAWA, TORONTO, EDMONTON AND VANCOUVER, AND BRANCH OFFICES ACROSS CANADA.IBC IS THE GOVERNMENT DESIGNATED STATISTICAL AGENT FOR AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE IN ONTARIO, ALBERTA, THE ATLANTIC PROVINCES AND THE TERRITORIES, AND FOR COMMERCIAL LIABILITY IN ONTARIO. IBC ALSO INCORPORATES THE VEHICLE INFORMATION CENTRE OF CANADA, WHICH COLLECTS AND ANALYZES DATA ON AND CONDUCTS RESEARCH ON VEHICLES AND VEHICLE PARTS.
Don Forgeron, President & Chief Executive Officer
Adresse :
777 Bay Street Suite 2400
P.O. Box 121
TORONTO, ON M5G 2C8
Canada
Numéro de téléphone :
416-362-2031
Numéro de fax :
416-644-4961
Ceci est le nom de l'agent responsable tel qu'indiqué dans l'enregistrement le plus récent de l'entreprise ou de l'organisation.
Nom | De | à |
---|---|---|
INSURANCE BUREAU OF CANADA/BUREAU D'ASSURANCE DU CANADA | 2024-04-08 | actuel |
INSURANCE BUREAU OF CANADA/BUREAU D'ASSURANCE DU CANADA | 2008-08-07 | 2024-04-08 |
Nom de l'agent responsable | De (aaaa-mm-jj) | À (aaaa-mm-jj) |
---|---|---|
Celyeste Power | 2023-01-01 | Actuel |
Don Forgeron | 2009-04-22 | 2023-01-01 |
Mark Yakabuski | 2008-01-23 | 2009-04-22 |
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant
Office of the Prime Minister, Privy Council Office |
avril 1990 à juillet 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Special Assistant
Parliament of Canada, Stan Wilbee, M.P. |
janvier 1989 à décembre 1989 | Pas une charge désignée |
Special Assistant
Parliament of Canada, Bob Brisco, M.P. |
août 1988 à novembre 1988 | Pas une charge désignée |
Constituency Assistant
Parliament of Canada, Chuck Cook, M.P. |
mai 1987 à août 1987 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Inspector, Vancouver Airport
Revenue Canada, Customs and Excise |
août 1994 à août 1995 | Pas une charge désignée |
Special Assistant & Press Secretary
Department of Transport, Office of the Minister |
avril 1991 à août 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Special Assistant and Press Secretary
Department of Labour, Office of the Minister |
avril 1990 à avril 1991 | Pas une charge désignée |
Special Assistant & Press Secretary
Parliament of Canada, Office of the Member of Parliament for Chambly |
mars 1985 à avril 1990 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Communications Manager
Parliament of Canada, Lawrence O'Neil, M.P. |
1983 à 1986 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Senior Policy Advisor
Treasury Board, Office of the President |
septembre 1982 à septembre 1984 | Pas une charge désignée |
Senior Policy Advisor
Department of Industry, Trade and Commerce, Office of the Minister |
mars 1980 à septembre 1982 | Pas une charge désignée |
Researcher and Policy Analyst
Department of Consumer and Corporate Affairs, Consumer Research Branch |
mars 1973 à août 1977 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Researcher
National Research Council, Atlantic Regional Laboratory, Halifax |
1981 à 1987 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Summer Student
Transport Canada, Transport Canada |
mai 1976 à août 1976 | Pas une charge désignée |
Summer Student
Transport Canada, Transport Canada |
mai 1975 à août 1975 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Primary Reserve Officer
Department of National Defence, Army Reserves |
novembre 2000 à août 2008 | Pas une charge désignée |
Reserve Officer
Department of National Defence, DND Supplementary Reserves |
avril 1993 à octobre 2000 | Pas une charge désignée |
Reserve Officer
Department of National Defence, Army Reserves |
février 1978 à mars 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |