Provider of internet-based products and services.
Sabrina Geremia, Managing Director
Address:
111 Richmond St West
Toronto, ON M5H 2G4
Canada
Telephone number:
416-915-8200
Google Canada Corporation does not have any subsidiaries that could have a direct interest in the outcome of the undertaking
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Google Canada Corporation | 2024-04-01 | current |
Google Canada Corporation | 2008-08-13 | 2024-04-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Sabrina Geremia | 2017-10-11 | Current |
Sam Sebastian | 2014-07-03 | 2017-10-11 |
nidhi shah | 2013-07-15 | 2014-07-03 |
Katherine Stephens | 2012-04-13 | 2013-07-15 |
Kent Walker | 2008-02-05 | 2012-04-13 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Associate Director of Stakeholder Relations
House of Commons, Office of the Leader of the Official Opposition |
October 2017 to July 2018 | Not a designated office |
Manager of Stakeholder Relations & Acting Manager of Tour and Events
House of Commons, Office of the Leader of the Official Opposition |
June 2017 to October 2017 | Not a designated office |
Manager of Tour and Events
House of Commons, Office of the Leader of the Official Opposition |
August 2016 to June 2017 | Not a designated office |
Special Advisor, Québec
Natural Resources Canada, Office of the Minister |
March 2015 to December 2015 | December 4, 2015 |
Director of Parliamentary and Stakeholder Relations
Citizenship and Immigration Canada, Office of the Minister |
October 2014 to February 2015 | February 20, 2015 |
Director of Parliamentary and Caucus Affairs
Canadian Heritage, Office of the Minister |
August 2013 to October 2014 | October 21, 2014 |
Senior Lobby Co-ordinator
House of Commons, Office of the Chief Government Whip |
June 2011 to August 2013 | August 9, 2013 |
Committees Co-ordinator
House of Commons, Office of the Chief Government Whip |
February 2010 to June 2011 | June 1, 2011 |
Special Assistant
House of Commons, Office of the Minister of State for the Status of Women |
July 2009 to February 2010 | February 5, 2010 |
Passport Co-ordinator
Royal Canadian Mounted Police, International Travel and Visits Branch |
May 2009 to July 2009 | Not a designated office |
Passport Co-ordinator
Royal Canadian Mounted Police, International Travel and Visits Branch |
May 2008 to September 2008 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
First Secretary, Agriculture & Fisheries
Global Affairs Canada, Embassy of Canada to the United States |
August 2011 to April 2013 | Not a designated office |
Second Secretary, Energy
Global Affairs Canada, Mission of Canada to the European Union |
August 2008 to August 2011 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director Research, Education and Outreach
Office of the Privacy Commissioner of Canada, Research, Education and Outreach |
April 2008 to April 2011 | Not a designated office |
Director, Communications
Office of the Privacy Commissioner of Canada, Communications Branch |
June 2007 to April 2008 | Not a designated office |
Manager, Strategic Communications
Department of Industry, Communications Branch |
January 2002 to June 2007 | Not a designated office |
Liaison Chief, Communications
Department of Transport, Communications Branch |
August 1997 to January 2002 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Associate Director of Stakeholder Relations
House of Commons, Office of the Leader of the Official Opposition |
October 2017 to July 2018 | Not a designated office |
Manager of Stakeholder Relations & Acting Manager of Tour and Events
House of Commons, Office of the Leader of the Official Opposition |
June 2017 to October 2017 | Not a designated office |
Manager of Tour and Events
House of Commons, Office of the Leader of the Official Opposition |
August 2016 to June 2017 | Not a designated office |
Special Advisor, Québec
Natural Resources Canada, Office of the Minister |
March 2015 to December 2015 | December 4, 2015 |
Director of Parliamentary and Stakeholder Relations
Citizenship and Immigration Canada, Office of the Minister |
October 2014 to February 2015 | February 20, 2015 |
Director of Parliamentary and Caucus Affairs
Canadian Heritage, Office of the Minister |
August 2013 to October 2014 | October 21, 2014 |
Senior Lobby Co-ordinator
House of Commons, Office of the Chief Government Whip |
June 2011 to August 2013 | August 9, 2013 |
Committees Co-ordinator
House of Commons, Office of the Chief Government Whip |
February 2010 to June 2011 | June 1, 2011 |
Special Assistant
House of Commons, Office of the Minister of State for the Status of Women |
July 2009 to February 2010 | February 5, 2010 |
Passport Co-ordinator
Royal Canadian Mounted Police, International Travel and Visits Branch |
May 2009 to July 2009 | Not a designated office |
Passport Co-ordinator
Royal Canadian Mounted Police, International Travel and Visits Branch |
May 2008 to September 2008 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Coordinator, International Media Centre/Operations
Summit Management Office, Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade |
January 2010 to January 2011 | Not a designated office |
Auxiliary Tour, Political Operations
House of Commons, Office of the Leader of the Official Opposition |
January 2009 to January 2010 | Not a designated office |
Member's Assistant
House of Commons, Office of the Member of Parliament for Etobicoke—Lakeshore |
August 2008 to January 2009 | Not a designated office |