Nombre total de rapports de communication : 240
Rapports mensuels de communications au cours des 6 derniers mois : 0
Spectra Energy Transmission is a North American leader in the long-haul transportation and storage of natural gas. For more than three-quarters of a century Spectra Energy Transmission and its predecessor companies have developed the critically important pipelines and related energy infrastructure that connects natural gas supply sources to premium markets. Based in Houston, Texas, the company's assets include about 18,000 miles of transmission pipeline and 265 billion cubic feet of storage capacity in the U.S. and Canada. Spectra Energy Transmission also has natural gas gathering, processing and distribution assets and natural gas liquids operations that are among the largest in Canada.
Douglas Bloom, President, SET West
Adresse :
Suite 2600
425 - 1st Street SW
Calgary, AB T2P 3L8
Canada
Numéro de téléphone :
403-699-1685
Numéro de fax :
403-699-1550
Ceci est le nom de l'agent responsable tel qu'indiqué dans l'enregistrement le plus récent de l'entreprise ou de l'organisation.
Nom | De | à |
---|---|---|
Westcoast Energy Inc., dba Spectra Energy Transmission | 2008-08-15 | 2017-07-16 |
Nom de l'agent responsable | De (aaaa-mm-jj) | À (aaaa-mm-jj) |
---|---|---|
Mark Fiedorek | 2013-01-01 | 2017-07-16 |
Douglas Bloom | 2008-01-24 | 2013-01-01 |
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Chief of Staff
Prime Minister's Office, Deputy Minister's Office |
1990 à 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Chief of Staff
Ministry of Finance, Deputy Minister's Office |
1989 à 1990 | Pas une charge désignée |