Pulse Canada is a confederation of industry and grower organizations with an interest in production and marketing of pea, lentil, bean and chickpea crops in Canada. Pulse Canada focuses on increasing demand for pulse crops, promotion of Canadian pulse crops, and on removal of barriers to trade or movement of pulse crops to markets around the world.
Gordon Bacon, Chief Executive Officer (CEO)
End date of the last completed financial year: 2013-03-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada (AAFC) | $1,741,591.00 | Yes |
Address:
1212-220 Portage Avenue
Winnipeg, MB R3C 0A5
Canada
Telephone number:
204-925-4452
Fax number:
204-925-4454
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Pulse Canada | 2024-04-14 | current |
Pulse Canada | 2008-07-01 | 2024-04-14 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Greg Cherewyk | 2021-01-29 | Current |
Gordon Bacon | 2008-03-25 | 2021-01-29 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Summer Student and Market Analyst
National Grains Bureau, AAFC |
May 2006 to October 2006 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Summer Student and Market Analyst
National Grains Bureau, AAFC |
May 2006 to October 2006 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Policy Advisor
Officer of the Minister of State for Grains & Oilseeds, Agriculture & Agri-food Canada |
July 1987 to October 1989 | Not a designated office |
Information Officer
Agriculture & Agri-Food Canada, Agriculture & Agri-food Canada |
June 1985 to July 1987 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Summer Student and Market Analyst
Canadian Grain Commission, AAFC |
May 1995 to October 1995 | Not a designated office |