Administrator of the Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan and manager of its pension fund.
Ronald Mock, President & Chief Executive Officer
Address:
5650 Yonge Street
Toronto, ON M2M 4H5
Canada
Telephone number:
416-228-5900
Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board | 2024-04-29 | current |
Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board | 2008-08-15 | 2024-04-29 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Andrew Jonathan Mark Taylor | 2020-01-01 | Current |
Ronald Mock | 2014-01-01 | 2020-01-01 |
James Leech | 2008-05-15 | 2014-01-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Advisor
DFAIT, Office of the Minister for International Trade |
January 2001 to July 2003 | Not a designated office |
Special Advisor
Department of foreign Affairs and International Trade, Office of the Minister for International Trade |
January 2001 to July 2003 | Not a designated office |