A safe, secure, reliable, sustainable and competitively priced supply of electricity is essential to Canada's prosperity. CEA is the voice of the Canadian electricity industry, promoting electricity as the critical enabler of the economy and Canadians' expectations for an enhanced quality of life.CEA is structured to represent the diverse interests of the evolving industry. The bulk of the policy and program work of the Association is delivered through a group of Councils. These councils develop and ensure the delivery of CEA programming in the areas of: Generation, Transmission, Distribution, Customer and Power Marketing
Pierre Guimond, President and Chief Executive Officer
Address:
350 Sparks Street
Suite 1100
Ottawa, ON K1R 7S8
Canada
Telephone number:
613-230-9263
Fax number:
613-230-9326
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
ELECTRICITY CANADA/ÉLECTRICITÉ CANADA | 2024-04-30 | current |
ELECTRICITY CANADA/ÉLECTRICITÉ CANADA | 2022-03-01 | 2024-04-30 |
CANADIAN ELECTRICITY ASSOCIATION/ASSOCIATION CANADIENNE DE L'ELECTRICITE | 2008-08-12 | 2022-03-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Francis Bradley | 2018-12-14 | Current |
Sergio Marchi | 2015-02-09 | 2018-12-14 |
Jim Burpee | 2012-02-02 | 2015-02-09 |
Pierre Guimond | 2008-05-30 | 2012-02-02 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Member of Parliament's Office |
January 2006 to November 2008 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
Department of Industry, Minister's Office |
June 2005 to January 2006 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Member of Parliament's Office |
September 2004 to May 2005 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Minister of Immigration, Minister's Office |
January 2004 to July 2004 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Analyst
Department of Industry Canada, Environmental Affairs Branch |
August 1999 to June 2000 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Administrative Assistant
Minister of Finance, Office of the Minister of Finance |
March 2002 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Administrative Assistant
Industry Canada, Minister's Office |
November 1993 to April 1997 | Not a designated office |
Administrative Assistant
Transport Canada, Deputy Minister's Office |
1983 to April 1988 | Not a designated office |
Administrative Assistant
National Defence, Deputy Minister and Minister's Office |
1979 to 1983 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Policy Advisor
Industry Canada, Office of John Manley |
November 1993 to July 1998 | Not a designated office |
Communications
Canadian Armed Forces, Communications Command Regiment 763 |
1978 to 1983 | Not a designated office |
Communications Command
Canadian Armed Forces, Communications Regiment 763 |
1978 to 1983 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Member of Parliament's Office |
January 2006 to November 2008 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
Department of Industry, Minister's Office |
June 2005 to January 2006 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Member of Parliament's Office |
September 2004 to May 2005 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Minister of Immigration, Minister's Office |
January 2004 to July 2004 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chief
Consumer and Corporate Affairs Canada, Voluntary Sector Division |
1984 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant
Veterans Affairs, Office of the Minister |
1983 to 1984 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant
Minister of State, Office of the Minister of State (Finance) |
1982 to 1983 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant
Public Works, Office of the Minister |
1981 to 1982 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Veterans Affairs, Office of the Minister |
1980 to 1981 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant
House of Commons, Office of the Speaker of the House of Commons |
1979 to 1979 | Not a designated office |
Special Assisant
Veterans Affairs, Office of the Minister |
1978 to 1979 | Not a designated office |