A world-leading manufacturer of innovative transportation solutions, from regional aircraft and business jets to rail transportation equipment, Bombardier Inc. is a global corporation headquartered in Canada.
Pierre Beaudoin, President and Chief Executive Officer
Address:
800 René-Lévesque Blvd West
29th Floor
Montreal, QC H3B 1Y8
Canada
Telephone number:
514-861-9481
Fax number:
514-861-3153
Bombardier Inc. is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Bombardier Inc. | 2024-05-15 | current |
Bombardier Inc. | 2008-07-01 | 2024-05-15 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Éric Martel | 2020-04-06 | Current |
Alain Bellemare | 2015-02-13 | 2020-04-06 |
Pierre Beaudoin | 2008-07-01 | 2015-02-13 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Public Affairs
Canadian Forces, Québec |
1990 to 1992 | Not a designated office |
Deputy Chief of Public Information
Canadian Forces, Europe |
1987 to 1990 | Not a designated office |
Principal Spokesman
Department of National Defence, Ottawa |
1984 to 1987 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Brigadier General and Chief of Staff Joint Operations
Canadian Forces, Canada |
1995 to 1997 | Not a designated office |
Commander of Fighter Groupe
Canadian Forces, Canada |
1995 to 1997 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant Chief of Defence
Canadian Forces, Canada |
1993 to 1995 | Not a designated office |
Colonel
Canadian Forces, Canada |
1986 to 1995 | Not a designated office |