Total Number of Communication Reports: 75
Monthly communication reports in the last 6 months: 0
Founded in 1848, the University of Ottawa is a bilingual institution and one of Canada's major research-intensive universities. The University has over 34,000 students from all parts of Canada and more than 150 countries enrolled, studying in over 300 programs across 10 faculties. The University of Ottawa is characterized by its unique history, its commitment to bilingualism and its location in the heart of the national capital and at the juncture of French and English Canada.
Allan Rock, President and Vice-Chancellor
End date of the last completed financial year: 2008-04-30
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Canada Research Chair | $7,237,000.00 | Yes |
Canadian Foundation for Innovation | $7,890,000.00 | Yes |
Social Sciences and Humanities Research Council (SSHRC) | $7,890,000.00 | Yes |
Natural Sciences and Engineering Research Council (NSERC) | $18,229,000.00 | Yes |
Canadian Institutes of Health Research (CIHR) | $32,310,000.00 | Yes |
Other Federal | $27,181,000.00 | Yes |
Health Canada (HC) | $1,261,000.00 | Yes |
Address:
550 rue Cumberland
Ottawa, ON K1N 6N5
Canada
Telephone number:
613-562-5809
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
University of Ottawa/Université d'Ottawa | 2024-04-29 | current |
University of Ottawa/Université d'Ottawa | 2008-07-15 | 2024-04-29 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Jacques Frémont | 2016-07-01 | Current |
Allan Rock | 2008-07-15 | 2016-07-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Minister responsible for Infrastructure
Infrastructure Canada, Office of the Minister |
August 2002 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Minister of Industry
Industry Canada, Office of the Minister |
January 2002 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Minister of Western Economic Diversification
Western Economic Diversification Canada, Office of the Minister |
January 2001 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Minister for the Atlantic Canada Opportunities Agency
Atlantic Canada Opportunities Agency, Office of the Minister |
January 2001 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Minister of Health
Health Canada, Office of the Minister |
June 1997 to January 2002 | Not a designated office |
Minister of Justice and Attorney General of Canada
Justice Canada, Office of the Minister |
November 1993 to June 2007 | Not a designated office |
Member of Parliament
Parliament, House of Commons |
November 1993 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student
Justice Canada, Civil Litigation |
May 1971 to August 1971 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student
Justice Canada, Civil Litigation |
May 1970 to August 1970 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Geological Mapping Assistant
Natural Resources Canada - Geological Survey of Canada, Precambrian Division |
May 1983 to August 1983 | Not a designated office |
Geological Mapping Assistant
Natural Resources Canada -Geological Survey of Canada, Precambrian Division |
May 1982 to August 1982 | Not a designated office |
Geological Mapping Assistant
Natural Resources Canada -Geological Survey of Canada, Precambrian Division |
May 1981 to September 1981 | Not a designated office |
Geological Mapping Assistant
Natural Resources Canada -Geological Survey of Canada, Precambrian Division |
May 1980 to August 1980 | Not a designated office |
Geologicial Mapping Assistant
Natural Resources Canada -Geological Survey of Canada, Precambrian Division |
May 1977 to August 1977 | Not a designated office |
Geological Mapping Assistant
Natural Resources Canada - Geological Survey of Canada, Precambrian Division |
May 1976 to August 1976 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Member of the Governing Council
Medical Research Council of Canada, Governing Council |
June 1996 to November 1999 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Analyste principal
Justice Canada, politiques pénales |
September 2003 to June 2006 | Not a designated office |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Deputy Director
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, CMC |
mars 2007 à mars 2008 | Pas une charge désignée |
Chief of Staff
Office of the Minister of Western Economic Diversification, Chief of Staff |
juillet 2004 à février 2006 | Pas une charge désignée |
Chief of Staff
Minister of State (Sport), Office of the Minister |
juillet 2004 à février 2006 | Pas une charge désignée |
Director of Communications
Public Works and Government Services, Office of the Minister |
janvier 2004 à juillet 2004 | Pas une charge désignée |
Director of Communications
Indian and Northern Affairs Canada, Office of the Minister |
mai 2001 à décembre 2003 | Pas une charge désignée |
Press Secretary
National Defence Canada, Office of the Minister |
avril 2000 à avril 2001 | Pas une charge désignée |
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Office of the Honourable Maria Minna, MP |
janvier 1997 à octobre 1997 | Pas une charge désignée |
Parliamentary Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Beryl Gaffney, MP |
mars 1996 à décembre 1996 | Pas une charge désignée |
Tour Guide
Veteran Affairs Canada, Vimy Ridge Monument |
septembre 1993 à novembre 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Tour Guide
House of Commons, Library of Parliament |
septembre 1992 à avril 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Tour Guide
National Capital Commission, MacKenzie King Estate |
mai 1992 à août 1992 | Pas une charge désignée |
Tour Guide
House of Commons, Library of Parliament |
octobre 1990 à avril 1992 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Directeur exécutif
MINISTÈRE DU PATRIMOINE CANADIEN, Affaires du portefeuille |
juin 2004 à septembre 2006 | Pas une charge désignée |
Directeur général
MINISTÈRE DU PATRIMOINE CANADIEN, Programmes d’appui aux langues officielles |
septembre 1994 à mai 2004 | Pas une charge désignée |
Directeur général
MINISTÈRE DU PATRIMOINE CANADIEN, Bureau des relations fédérales-provinciales |
septembre 1993 à août 1994 | Pas une charge désignée |
Directeur général
SECRÉTARIAT D’ÉTAT, Secteur Aide à l’éducation – Langues officielles en éducation |
septembre 1992 à août 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Conseiller spécial – Conseil de l’Europe
SECRÉTARIAT D’ÉTAT, Secteur Aide à l’éducation |
septembre 1990 à août 1992 | Pas une charge désignée |
Directeur général
SECRÉTARIAT D’ÉTAT, Secteur Aide à l’éducation – Langues officielles en éducation |
septembre 1987 à août 1990 | Pas une charge désignée |
Directeur - Développement de politiques, analyse et recherches
SECRÉTARIAT D’ÉTAT, Secteur Aide à l’éducation – Langues officielles en éducation |
septembre 1984 à août 1987 | Pas une charge désignée |
Directeur - Opérations et coordination régionale
SECRÉTARIAT D’ÉTAT, Secteur Aide à l’éducation – Langues officielles en éducation |
janvier 1982 à août 1984 | Pas une charge désignée |
Coordonnateur national
SECRÉTARIAT D’ÉTAT, Secteur Langues officielles - Développement des minorités linguistiques |
septembre 1979 à décembre 1981 | Pas une charge désignée |
Agent de développement communautaire
SECRÉTARIAT D’ÉTAT, Secteur Langues officielles - Développement des minorités linguistiques |
juillet 1974 à août 1979 | Pas une charge désignée |
Professeur de français langue seconde
COMMISSION DE LA FONCTION PUBLIQUE, École de langues |
septembre 1971 à juin 1974 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Executive Assistant
Department of Indian Affairs and Northern Development, Office of the Minister |
décembre 1993 à janvier 1997 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Minister responsible for Infrastructure
Infrastructure Canada, Office of the Minister |
août 2002 à décembre 2003 | Pas une charge désignée |
Minister of Industry
Industry Canada, Office of the Minister |
janvier 2002 à décembre 2003 | Pas une charge désignée |
Minister of Western Economic Diversification
Western Economic Diversification Canada, Office of the Minister |
janvier 2001 à décembre 2003 | Pas une charge désignée |
Minister for the Atlantic Canada Opportunities Agency
Atlantic Canada Opportunities Agency, Office of the Minister |
janvier 2001 à décembre 2003 | Pas une charge désignée |
Minister of Health
Health Canada, Office of the Minister |
juin 1997 à janvier 2002 | Pas une charge désignée |
Minister of Justice and Attorney General of Canada
Justice Canada, Office of the Minister |
novembre 1993 à juin 2007 | Pas une charge désignée |
Member of Parliament
Parliament, House of Commons |
novembre 1993 à décembre 2003 | Pas une charge désignée |
Summer Student
Justice Canada, Civil Litigation |
mai 1971 à août 1971 | Pas une charge désignée |
Summer Student
Justice Canada, Civil Litigation |
mai 1970 à août 1970 | Pas une charge désignée |