Total Number of Communication Reports: 75
Monthly communication reports in the last 6 months: 0
Founded in 1848, the University of Ottawa is a bilingual institution and one of Canada's major research-intensive universities. The University has over 34,000 students from all parts of Canada and more than 150 countries enrolled, studying in over 300 programs across 10 faculties. The University of Ottawa is characterized by its unique history, its commitment to bilingualism and its location in the heart of the national capital and at the juncture of French and English Canada.
Allan Rock, President and Vice-Chancellor
End date of the last completed financial year: 2012-04-30
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Canada Research Chair | $6,602,000.00 | Yes |
Canadian Foundation for Innovation | $12,611,000.00 | Yes |
Canadian Institutes of Health Research (CIHR) | $51,484,000.00 | Yes |
Health Canada (HC) | $2,714,000.00 | Yes |
Natural Sciences and Engineering Research Council (NSERC) | $26,265,000.00 | Yes |
Other Federal | $49,382,000.00 | Yes |
Social Sciences and Humanities Research Council (SSHRC) | $12,701,000.00 | Yes |
Address:
550 rue Cumberland
Ottawa, ON K1N 6N5
Canada
Telephone number:
613-562-5809
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
University of Ottawa/Université d'Ottawa | 2024-04-29 | current |
University of Ottawa/Université d'Ottawa | 2008-07-15 | 2024-04-29 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Jacques Frémont | 2016-07-01 | Current |
Allan Rock | 2008-07-15 | 2016-07-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Minister responsible for Infrastructure
Infrastructure Canada, Office of the Minister |
August 2002 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Minister of Industry
Industry Canada, Office of the Minister |
January 2002 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Minister of Western Economic Diversification
Western Economic Diversification Canada, Office of the Minister |
January 2001 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Minister for the Atlantic Canada Opportunities Agency
Atlantic Canada Opportunities Agency, Office of the Minister |
January 2001 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Minister of Health
Health Canada, Office of the Minister |
June 1997 to January 2002 | Not a designated office |
Member of Parliament
Parliament, House of Commons |
November 1993 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Minister of Justice and Attorney General of Canada
Justice Canada, Office of the Minister |
November 1993 to June 2007 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student
Justice Canada, Civil Litigation |
May 1971 to August 1971 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student
Justice Canada, Civil Litigation |
May 1970 to August 1970 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Member of the Governing Council
Medical Research Council of Canada, Governing Council |
June 1996 to November 1999 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Analyste principal
Justice Canada, politiques pénales |
September 2003 to June 2006 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Deputy Director
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, CMC |
March 2007 to March 2008 | Not a designated office |
Chief of Staff
Office of the Minister of Western Economic Diversification, Chief of Staff |
July 2004 to February 2006 | Not a designated office |
Chief of Staff
Minister of State (Sport), Office of the Minister |
July 2004 to February 2006 | Not a designated office |
Director of Communications
Public Works and Government Services, Office of the Minister |
January 2004 to July 2004 | Not a designated office |
Director of Communications
Indian and Northern Affairs Canada, Office of the Minister |
May 2001 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Press Secretary
National Defence Canada, Office of the Minister |
April 2000 to April 2001 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Office of the Honourable Maria Minna, MP |
January 1997 to October 1997 | Not a designated office |
Parliamentary Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Beryl Gaffney, MP |
March 1996 to December 1996 | Not a designated office |
Tour Guide
Veteran Affairs Canada, Vimy Ridge Monument |
September 1993 to November 1993 | Not a designated office |
Tour Guide
House of Commons, Library of Parliament |
September 1992 to April 1993 | Not a designated office |
Tour Guide
National Capital Commission, MacKenzie King Estate |
May 1992 to August 1992 | Not a designated office |
Tour Guide
House of Commons, Library of Parliament |
October 1990 to April 1992 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Appointments
Privy Council Office, Office of the Prime Minister |
November 1993 to December 1997 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Auxiliaire juridique
Supreme Court of Canada, Office of Chief Justice Antonio Lamar |
September 1993 to August 1994 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Partnerships & Citizen Engagement
Canadian Institutes of Health Research, Public, Government and Institute Affairs |
May 2012 to November 2012 | Not a designated office |
Director of Governance & Corporate Secretary
Canadian Institutes of Health Research, Corporate Affairs |
March 2006 to May 2012 | Not a designated office |
Senior Advisor, Issues Management
Health Canada, ADMO, HPFB |
June 2005 to March 2006 | Not a designated office |
Senior Advisor, Portfolio Management
Health Canada, Deputy Minister's Office |
January 2005 to May 2005 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
Industry Canada, Minister's Office |
January 2002 to July 2002 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
Health Canada, Minister's Office |
September 1998 to January 2002 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Minister responsible for Infrastructure
Infrastructure Canada, Office of the Minister |
August 2002 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Minister of Industry
Industry Canada, Office of the Minister |
January 2002 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Minister of Western Economic Diversification
Western Economic Diversification Canada, Office of the Minister |
January 2001 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Minister for the Atlantic Canada Opportunities Agency
Atlantic Canada Opportunities Agency, Office of the Minister |
January 2001 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Minister of Health
Health Canada, Office of the Minister |
June 1997 to January 2002 | Not a designated office |
Member of Parliament
Parliament, House of Commons |
November 1993 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Minister of Justice and Attorney General of Canada
Justice Canada, Office of the Minister |
November 1993 to June 2007 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student
Justice Canada, Civil Litigation |
May 1971 to August 1971 | Not a designated office |
Summer Student
Justice Canada, Civil Litigation |
May 1970 to August 1970 | Not a designated office |