Total Number of Communication Reports: 75
Monthly communication reports in the last 6 months: 0
Founded in 1848, the University of Ottawa is a bilingual institution and one of Canada's major research-intensive universities. The University has over 34,000 students from all parts of Canada and more than 150 countries enrolled, studying in over 300 programs across 10 faculties. The University of Ottawa is characterized by its unique history, its commitment to bilingualism and its location in the heart of the national capital and at the juncture of French and English Canada.
Jacques Frémont, President and Vice-Chancellor
End date of the last completed financial year: 2017-04-30
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Canada Foundation for Innovation | $6,068,000.00 | Yes |
Canada Research Chairs | $8,834,000.00 | Yes |
Canadian Institutes of Health Research (CIHR) | $54,802,000.00 | Yes |
Health Canada (HC) | $5,726,000.00 | Yes |
Natural Sciences and Engineering Research Council (NSERC) | $22,617,000.00 | Yes |
Other federal grants | $58,310,000.00 | Yes |
Social Sciences and Humanities Research Council (SSHRC) | $11,812,000.00 | Yes |
Address:
550 rue Cumberland
Ottawa, ON K1N 6N5
Canada
Telephone number:
613-562-5809
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
University of Ottawa/Université d'Ottawa | 2024-04-29 | current |
University of Ottawa/Université d'Ottawa | 2008-07-15 | 2024-04-29 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Jacques Frémont | 2016-07-01 | Current |
Allan Rock | 2008-07-15 | 2016-07-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Executive Director (Printable Electronic Flagship Program)
National Research Council, Institute for Microstructural Sciences |
May 2011 to April 2013 | Not a designated office |
Lead Director (Canadian Photonic Fabrication Centre)
National Research Council, Institute for Microstructural Sciences |
2002 to May 2011 | Not a designated office |
Director, Components Technologies
National Research Council, Institute for Microstructural Sciences |
1998 to January 2000 | Not a designated office |
various
National Research Council, Institute for Microstructural Sciences |
October 1988 to 1998 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Advisor to CEO
National Roundtable on the Environment and the Economy, Office of the CEO |
August 2007 to April 2008 | Not a designated office |
Acting Chief Executive Officer
National Roundtable on the Environment and the Economy, Office of the CEO |
January 2005 to August 2007 | Not a designated office |
Senior Policy Advisor
National Roundtable on the Environment and the Economy, Policy |
January 2002 to January 2005 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Analyste principal
Justice Canada, politiques pénales |
September 2003 to June 2006 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Executive Director (Printable Electronic Flagship Program)
National Research Council, Institute for Microstructural Sciences |
May 2011 to April 2013 | Not a designated office |
Lead Director (Canadian Photonic Fabrication Centre)
National Research Council, Institute for Microstructural Sciences |
2002 to May 2011 | Not a designated office |
Director, Components Technologies
National Research Council, Institute for Microstructural Sciences |
1998 to January 2000 | Not a designated office |
various
National Research Council, Institute for Microstructural Sciences |
October 1988 to 1998 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Partnerships & Citizen Engagement
Canadian Institutes of Health Research, Public, Government and Institute Affairs |
May 2012 to November 2012 | Not a designated office |
Director of Governance & Corporate Secretary
Canadian Institutes of Health Research, Corporate Affairs |
March 2006 to May 2012 | Not a designated office |
Senior Advisor, Issues Management
Health Canada, ADMO, HPFB |
June 2005 to March 2006 | Not a designated office |
Senior Advisor, Portfolio Management
Health Canada, Deputy Minister's Office |
January 2005 to May 2005 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
Industry Canada, Minister's Office |
January 2002 to July 2002 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
Health Canada, Minister's Office |
September 1998 to January 2002 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Executive Director, Environmental Assessment and Marine Program
Environment Canada, Environmental Protection Operations Directorate |
May 2009 to May 2012 | Not a designated office |
Director General, Partnerships and Stakeholder Relations
Environment Canada, Policy Branch |
September 2005 to May 2009 | Not a designated office |
Director of Strategic Policy
Environment Canada, Environmental Protection Branch |
January 2000 to September 2005 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor
Environment Canada, Office of the Minister |
September 1997 to January 2000 | Not a designated office |