The organization is a Canadian university. Brock University was founded in 1964. The University looks to the different levels of government to fund research, infrastructure and student needs.
Lesley Rigg, President and Vice-Chancellor
End date of the last completed financial year: 2023-04-30
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Canada Foundation for Innovation | $380,000.00 | Yes |
Canada research chairs | $1,299,000.00 | Yes |
Canadian Institutes of Health Research (CIHR) | $901,000.00 | Yes |
Canadian Space Agency (CSA) | $100,000.00 | No |
Employment and Social Development Canada (ESDC) | $641,000.00 | Yes |
Environment and Climate Change Canada (ECCC) | $13,000.00 | No |
Federal Economic Development Agency for Southern Ontario (FedDev) | $927,000.00 | No |
National Defence (DND) | $41,000.00 | No |
National Research Council (NRC) | $85,000.00 | Yes |
Natural Sciences and Engineering Research Council (NSERC) | $4,160,000.00 | Yes |
other | $118,000.00 | No |
Parks Canada (PC) | $4,000.00 | No |
Provincial | $100,144,000.00 | Yes |
Public Health Agency of Canada (PHAC) | $90,000.00 | Yes |
Research Support Fund | $2,467,000.00 | Yes |
Social Sciences and Humanities Research Council (SSHRC) | $2,612,000.00 | Yes |
Tri-Agency | $490,000.00 | No |
Address:
1812 Sir Isaac Brock Way
St. Catharines, ON L2S 3A1
Canada
Telephone number:
905-688-5550
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Brock University | 2024-04-01 | current |
Brock University | 2008-08-12 | 2024-04-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Lesley Rigg | 2022-11-01 | Current |
Lynn Wells | 2021-07-01 | 2022-11-01 |
Gervan Fearon | 2017-08-01 | 2021-07-01 |
Tom Traves | 2016-10-01 | 2017-08-01 |
Brian Hutchings | 2016-09-01 | 2016-10-01 |
Jack Lightstone | 2008-08-12 | 2016-06-30 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Constituency Office Manager
Office of Member of Parliament Tony Baldinelli, Office of Member of Parliament Tony Baldinelli |
December 2019 to September 2023 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Constituency Office Manager
Office of Member of Parliament Tony Baldinelli, Office of Member of Parliament Tony Baldinelli |
December 2019 to September 2023 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Constituency Assistant
House of Commons, Member of Parliament Office - St Catharines |
November 2015 to January 2022 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Regional Economic Advisor
Department of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada, Office of the Minister of Innovation, Science, and Economic Development |
April 2018 to September 2018 | September 8, 2018 |
Special Assistant (Regional Economic Development)
Department of Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada, Office of the Minister of Innovation, Science, and Economic Development |
February 2016 to April 2018 | April 2, 2018 |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant
Member of Parliament, Parliament Hill Office |
April 2006 to August 2008 | Not a designated office |