The Canadian Association of Petroleum Producers (CAPP) is a non-partisan, research-based industry association that advocates on behalf of our member companies, large and small, that explore for, develop, and produce oil and natural gas throughout Canada. Our associate members provide a wide range of services that support the upstream industry. CAPP’s members produce nearly three quarters of Canada’s annual oil and natural gas production and provides more than 400,000 jobs in nearly all regions of Canada. In 2022 across Canada, our industry contributed $111 billion to the Gross Domestic Product (GDP) and paid $45 billion in taxes and royalty payments. CAPP is a solution-oriented partner and works with all levels of government to ensure a thriving Canadian oil and natural gas industry. We strive to meet the need for safe, reliable, affordable, and responsibly produced energy, for Canada and the world. We are proud to amplify industry efforts to reduce GHG emissions from oil and gas production and support Indigenous participation and prosperity.
LISA BAITON, President and CEO
Adresse :
2100, 350 - 7 Avenue S.W.
Calgary, AB T2P 3N9
Canada
Numéro de téléphone :
416-969-2702
Numéro de fax :
416-920-1822
Ceci est le nom de l'agent responsable tel qu'indiqué dans l'enregistrement le plus récent de l'entreprise ou de l'organisation.
Nom | De | à |
---|---|---|
Canadian Association of Petroleum Producers/Association Canadienne des Producteurs Pétroliers | 2024-03-01 | actuel |
Canadian Association of Petroleum Producers/Association Canadienne des Producteurs Pétroliers | 2008-09-15 | 2024-03-01 |
Nom de l'agent responsable | De (aaaa-mm-jj) | À (aaaa-mm-jj) |
---|---|---|
LISA BAITON | 2022-05-02 | Actuel |
Tim McMillan | 2015-01-01 | 2022-05-02 |
David Collyer | 2008-09-15 | 2015-01-01 |
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Financial Analyst / Economist
National Energy Board, N/A |
janvier 2005 à février 2008 | Pas une charge désignée |
Manager, Policy Research and Economist
House of Commons, Office of the Leader of the Official Opposition |
mars 2002 à septembre 2004 | Pas une charge désignée |
Economist
House of Commons, Office of the Leader of the Official Opposition |
janvier 1999 à mars 2002 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Industrial Benefits Analyst; Deputy Registrar
Canada-Newfoundland Offshore Petroleum Board, n/a |
juin 1990 à août 1998 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Officer Cadet
Department National Defence, Canadian Armed Forces |
mai 2002 à mai 2006 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Chief of Staff
House of Commons, Office of the Leader of the Official Opposition |
2007 à décembre 2008 | Pas une charge désignée |
Special Policy Advisor
Prime Minister's Office, (PMO) |
2001 à 2003 | Pas une charge désignée |
Chief of Staff
Privy Council Office, Office of the Minister of Intergovernmental Affairs |
1999 à 2001 | Pas une charge désignée |
Judicial Affairs Advisor
Justice Canada, Office of the Minister & Attorney General |
1994 à 1995 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Press Secretary
Department of Health, Office of the Minister |
janvier 2005 à février 2006 | Pas une charge désignée |
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Office of the Member of Parliament for Sudbury |
avril 2002 à janvier 2005 | Pas une charge désignée |
Parliamentary Assistant
House of Commons, Office of the Member of Parliament for Ottawa West—Nepean |
juin 2001 à avril 2002 | Pas une charge désignée |
Parliamentary Assistant
House of Commons, Office of the Member of Parliament for Beaches—East York |
octobre 1999 à juin 2001 | Pas une charge désignée |
Parliamentary Assistant
House of Commons, Office of the Member of Parliament for Papineau—St. Denis |
septembre 1997 à octobre 1999 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant (then Executive Assistant)
Agriculture & Agri-Food Canada, Office of the Minister |
1991 à octobre 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Environmental Officer & Acting Senior Environmental Officer
National Capital Commission, - |
octobre 2002 à mars 2005 | Pas une charge désignée |
Student
Department of Transport, Environmental Affairs, Programs & Divestiture |
janvier 1999 à avril 1999 | Pas une charge désignée |