The Canadian Association of Petroleum Producers (CAPP) represents companies, large and small, that explore for, develop and produce natural gas and crude oil throughout Canada. CAPP’s member companies produce about 90 per cent of Canada’s natural gas and crude oil. CAPP's associate members provide a wide range of services that support the upstream crude oil and natural gas industry. Together CAPP's members and associate members are an important part of a $110-billion-a-year national industry that provides essential energy products. CAPP’s mission is to enhance the economic sustainability of the Canadian upstream petroleum industry in a safe and environmentally and socially responsible manner, through constructive engagement and communication with governments, the public and stakeholders in the communities in which we operate.
David Collyer, President
Address:
2100, 350 - 7 Avenue S.W.
Calgary, AB T2P 3N9
Canada
Telephone number:
403-267-1100
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Canadian Association of Petroleum Producers/Association Canadienne des Producteurs Pétroliers | 2024-03-01 | current |
Canadian Association of Petroleum Producers/Association Canadienne des Producteurs Pétroliers | 2008-09-15 | 2024-03-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
LISA BAITON | 2022-05-02 | Current |
Tim McMillan | 2015-01-01 | 2022-05-02 |
David Collyer | 2008-09-15 | 2015-01-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director
Energy Supply Branch, National Energy Board |
1989 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
Director
National Energy Board, Energy Supply Branch |
1989 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Crude Oil Market Analyst
National Energy Board, Commodities Business Unit - Oil/NGL Team |
February 2003 to November 2007 | Not a designated office |
Assistant Market Analyst
Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada, Market Analysis Division |
March 1999 to August 1999 | Not a designated office |
Research Assistant
Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Market Analysis Division |
January 1997 to April 1997 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Manager
National Energy Board, Refined Oil Division, Oil Branch |
1974 to 1987 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Co-Chair, Electricity Issues Table (consultant to NRCan)
Natural Resources Canada, n/a |
1999 to 2001 | Not a designated office |
Researcher
Energy, Mines & Resources, n/a |
May 1974 to October 1974 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Counsel
National Energy Board, /a |
November 1981 to February 1985 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Program Manager
Department of Indian and Northern Affairs, n/a |
1979 to 1980 | Not a designated office |
Economist/Program Manager
Transport Canada, n/a |
1974 to 1979 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Communications Advisor - Prairie and Northern Region
Environment Canada, Program Advice and Support, Communications |
October 2009 to January 2010 | Not a designated office |
Chief of Events
Environment Canada, Ministerial Communications Services, Communications |
January 2009 to July 2009 | Not a designated office |
Senior Communications Advisor
Environment Canada, Ministerial Communications Services, Communications |
February 2008 to January 2009 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Industrial Benefits Analyst; Deputy Registrar
Canada-Newfoundland Offshore Petroleum Board, n/a |
June 1990 to August 1998 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director
Energy Supply Branch, National Energy Board |
1989 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
Director
National Energy Board, Energy Supply Branch |
1989 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Team Leader
National Energy Board, TransCanada Pipelines |
2005 to 2006 | Not a designated office |
Project Lead
Natural Resources Canada, Crown Consultation Unit |
2004 to 2005 | Not a designated office |
Technical Leader
National Energy Board, Markets |
2003 to 2004 | Not a designated office |
Project Manager
National Energy Board, Support and Demand Report |
2001 to 2003 | Not a designated office |
Economist, Market Analyst, Senior Market Analyst
National Energy Board, Natural Gas Market Assessments |
1989 to 2001 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Communications Assistant
Natural Resources Canada, Public Affairs Department |
January 2001 to June 2001 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Employer Relations Coordinator
Hire A Student, Calgary |
April 1980 to June 1980 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Field inspection and project application review
National Energy Board, n/a |
1991 to 1993 | Not a designated office |