THE CANADIAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION (CMA) IS THE NATIONAL VOICE OF CANADIAN PHYSICIANS. FOUNDED IN 1867, CMA'S MISSION IS TO SERVE AND UNITE THE PHYSICIANS OF CANADA AND BE THE NATIONAL ADVOCATE, IN PARTNERSHIP WITH THE PEOPLE OF CANADA FOR THE HIGHEST STANDARDS OF HEALTH AND HEALTH CARE. ON BEHALF OF ITS MEMBERS AND THE CANADIAN PUBLIC, CMA PERFORMS A WIDE VARIETY OF FUNCTIONS, SUCH AS ADVOCATING HEALTH PROMOTION AND DISEASE/INJURY PREVENTION POLICIES AND STRATEGIES, ADVOCATING FOR ACCESS TO QUALITY HEALTH CARE, FACILITATING CHANGE WITHIN THE MEDICAL PROFESSION, AND PROVIDING LEADERSHIP AND GUIDANCE TO PHYSICIANS TO HELP THEM INFLUENCE, MANAGE AND ADAPT TO CHANGES IN HEALTH CARE DELIVERY.
Paul-Émile Cloutier, Secretary General and Chief Executive Officer
End date of the last completed financial year: 2011-12-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Health Canada (HC) | $327,307.77 | Yes |
Address:
1867 Alta Vista Drive
Ottawa, ON K1G 5W8
Canada
Telephone number:
613-731-8610
Ext.
1241
Fax number:
613-731-1755
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Canadian Medical Association/Association médicale canadienne | 2024-03-01 | current |
Canadian Medical Association/Association médicale canadienne | 2008-10-07 | 2024-03-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Timothy Smith | 2013-12-08 | Current |
Paul-Émile Cloutier | 2009-07-20 | 2013-12-08 |
Barbara Drew | 2008-10-07 | 2009-07-20 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Communications
Minister of Canadian Heritage, Canadian Heritage |
January 1998 to May 2001 | Not a designated office |
Senior Communications advisor
Minister of State and Leader of the Government in the House of Commons, House of Commons |
June 1997 to January 1998 | Not a designated office |
Senior Communications Advisor
Minister's Office, Minister Responsible for CIDA and La Francophonie |
January 1997 to June 1997 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Research Analyst, Senior Research Analyst
Statistics Canada, Health Division |
September 1978 to October 1990 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Program Officer
Health Canada, Division of Aging and Senior |
October 1996 to May 1998 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Manager, Medical Care Information Database
Health Canada, Policy, Communication & Information Branch |
January 1985 to December 1992 | Not a designated office |
Research Officer
Health Canada, Health System Branch |
November 1977 to December 1984 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Policy Advisor
International Affairs, Department of Indian Affairs and Northern Development |
1992 to 1995 | Not a designated office |
Chief of Staff and Senior Advisor
Minister's Office, External Relations and International Development |
1986 to 1992 | Not a designated office |
Executive and Legislation Assistant to the Minister of Immigration, Walter Maclean and Flora MacDonald
Minister's Office, Department of Immigration |
1985 to 1986 | Not a designated office |
Senior Advisor, Industrial Relations
Canada Ports Corporation, Industrial Relations |
1980 to 1985 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Consultant, Medical Ethics
Canadian Armed Forces, Not applicable |
July 2003 to August 2003 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Canalman
Parks Canada, Rideau Canal |
1986 to 1990 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Acting Chief, National Hospital Productivity & Promotion Branch
Health & Welfare Canada, Health Services & Promotion Branch |
December 1983 to March 1990 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Advisor
The Senate of Canada, The Honourable Aurélien Gill, Senator |
March 2009 to May 2009 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor
The Senate of Canada, The Honourable Charlie Watt, Senator |
February 2007 to February 2009 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor
The Senate of Canada, The Honourable Jean Lapointe, Senator |
September 2001 to May 2010 | Not a designated office |
Senior Advisor
Heritage Canada, Office of the Secretary of State (Multicultarism) Status of Women |
February 2000 to September 2001 | Not a designated office |
Senior Advisor
The Senate of Canada, The Honourable Pierre De Bané, Senator |
May 1999 to January 2000 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Program Analyst
Statistics Canada, Resourcing and Corporate Assignments |
June 2007 to August 2007 | Not a designated office |
Program Analyst
Statistics Canada, Resourcing and Corporate Assignments |
June 2005 to June 2005 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director General, Acting
Health Canada, Public Health Agency of Canada |
2006 to 2007 | Not a designated office |
Associate Director General
Health Canada, Public Health Agency of Canada/Office for Public Health Practice |
2005 to 2006 | Not a designated office |
Executive Director/Acting
Health Canada, First Nations and Inuit Health Branch |
2004 to 2005 | Not a designated office |
Associate Director
Public Health Agency of Canada, Centre for Infectious Diseases |
2003 to 2004 | Not a designated office |
Chief/Division of Blood Borne Pathogens/medical Specialist Blood Borne Pathogens/Chief Division of HIV/AIDS Surveillance/medical epidemiologist/medical consultant
Health Canada, Laboratory Centre for Disease Control and Federal Centre for AIDS |
1992 to 1998 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Statistical Analyst (University co-op placement)
Industry Canada, Automotive & Transportation Division |
1997 to 1997 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director General
Health Canada, Office of Health and the Information Highway |
2000 to 2002 | Not a designated office |
Regional Director General
Health Canada, Central Region |
1993 to 2000 | Not a designated office |
Director General
Health and Welfare Canada, Communications |
1991 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Director of Operations and Communications
Privy Council Office, Communications Secretariat |
1988 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
Executive Director
Health and Welfare Canada, Celebration 88 |
1987 to 1988 | Not a designated office |
Director of Evaluation
Transport Canada, Evaluation |
1986 to 1987 | Not a designated office |
Executive Director
Transport Canada, Federal Coordination Secretariat - Expo 86 |
1985 to 1986 | Not a designated office |
Director Policy, Planning and Finance
Transport Canada, Water Transportation Assistance Directorate, Surface Administration |
1981 to 1983 | Not a designated office |
Regional Director Air Planning and Programming
Transport Canada, Air Administration |
1974 to 1980 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant to the Secretary of State
Industry Canada, Office of the Secretary of State for Science, Research & Development |
August 1995 to November 1995 | Not a designated office |