The Canadian Medical Association (CMA) is a national, voluntary association of physicians that advocates on behalf of its members and the public for access to high-quality health care. The CMA also provides leadership and guidance to physicians. The CMA was formed in Quebec City in 1867, just three months after the birth of Canada. It was created by 164 physicians who recognized the need for a national medical body. They selected Sir Charles Tupper, who would later serve as Canada's prime minister, as the first president. Today the CMA has more than 85,000 members, and advocates on behalf of both members and their patients — on Parliament Hill, during federal election campaigns and in the media. The CMA also takes the lead on public health issues. CMA’s Mission: Helping physicians care for patients. CMA’s Vision: The CMA will be the leader in engaging and serving physicians, and the national voice for the highest standards for health and health care.
Timothy Smith, Chief Executive Officer
Adresse :
1410 Blair Towers Place
Suite 500
Ottawa, ON K1J 9B9
Canada
Numéro de téléphone :
613-731-8610
Ceci est le nom de l'agent responsable tel qu'indiqué dans l'enregistrement le plus récent de l'entreprise ou de l'organisation.
Nom | De | à |
---|---|---|
Canadian Medical Association/Association médicale canadienne | 2024-03-01 | actuel |
Canadian Medical Association/Association médicale canadienne | 2008-10-07 | 2024-03-01 |
Nom de l'agent responsable | De (aaaa-mm-jj) | À (aaaa-mm-jj) |
---|---|---|
Timothy Smith | 2013-12-08 | Actuel |
Paul-Émile Cloutier | 2009-07-20 | 2013-12-08 |
Barbara Drew | 2008-10-07 | 2009-07-20 |
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Receptionist
Department of Employment and Immigration, Office of the Minister of Employment and Immigration |
septembre 1980 à septembre 1987 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Service desk coordinator
Canadian Science and Technology Museum Corporation, N/A |
1999 à 2001 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Tour Officer, NDP Leader's Office
House of Commons, NDP Leader's Office |
février 2019 à novembre 2019 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Consultant, Medical Ethics
Canadian Armed Forces, Not applicable |
juillet 2003 à août 2003 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Receptionist
Department of Employment and Immigration, Office of the Minister of Employment and Immigration |
septembre 1980 à septembre 1987 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Research Analyst, Senior Research Analyst
Statistics Canada, Health Division |
septembre 1978 à octobre 1990 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Constituency Assistance
House of Commons, Office of Paul Dewar, Member of Parliament |
octobre 2012 à avril 2014 | Pas une charge désignée |
Parliamentary Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Denise Savoie, Member of Parliament and Deputy Speaker |
août 2011 à août 2012 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Secretary
National Capital Commission, Surveys and Mapping |
décembre 1989 à août 1992 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Social Policy Researcher
Crown-Indigenous Relations and Northern Affairs Canada, Policy and Strategic Direction |
janvier 2021 à décembre 2021 | Pas une charge désignée |
Policy Analyst
Global Affairs, Global Issues and Development |
janvier 2018 à mars 2018 | Pas une charge désignée |
Policy Analyst
Global Affairs, Global Issues and Development |
juin 2017 à octobre 2017 | Pas une charge désignée |
Policy Analyst
Global Affairs, Global Issues and Development |
janvier 2015 à juillet 2015 | Pas une charge désignée |
Junior Research and Policy Analyst
Global Affairs, Global Issues and Development |
mai 2014 à août 2014 | Pas une charge désignée |
Junior Research and Policy Analyst
Global Affairs, Global Issues and Development |
septembre 2013 à décembre 2013 | Pas une charge désignée |
Program Officer
Canada Border Services Agency, Pre-Border Programs Directorate, Programs Branch |
janvier 2013 à avril 2013 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant to the Secretary of State
Industry Canada, Office of the Secretary of State for Science, Research & Develo |
août 1995 à novembre 1995 | Pas une charge désignée |
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Maurizio Bevilacqua, Member of Parliament |
janvier 1991 à novembre 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Special Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Paul Martin, Member of Parliament |
mai 1989 à janvier 1991 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Legal and Policy Researcher and Program Manager
Royal Commission on New Reproductive Technologies, N/A |
avril 1990 à mai 1994 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Policy Advisor
The Senate of Canada, The Honourable Aurélien Gill, Senator |
mars 2009 à mai 2009 | Pas une charge désignée |
Policy Advisor
The Senate of Canada, The Honourable Charlie Watt, Senator |
février 2007 à février 2009 | Pas une charge désignée |
Policy Advisor
The Senate of Canada, The Honourable Jean Lapointe, Senator |
septembre 2001 à mai 2010 | Pas une charge désignée |
Senior Advisor
Heritage Canada, Office of the Secretary of State (Multicultarism) Status of Women |
février 2000 à septembre 2001 | Pas une charge désignée |
Senior Advisor
The Senate of Canada, The Honourable Pierre De Bané, Senator |
mai 1999 à janvier 2000 | Pas une charge désignée |
Press Office Assistant
House of Commons, Prime Minister's Office |
septembre 1997 à septembre 1999 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Intern
House of Commons, Office of Keith Martin, Member of Parliament |
septembre 2006 à février 2007 | Pas une charge désignée |
Assistant coordinator
National Capital Commission, Welcome Centre |
avril 2006 à septembre 2006 | Pas une charge désignée |
Assistant coordinator
National Capital Commission, Welcome Centre |
avril 2005 à septembre 2005 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Senior Marketing Officer
National Arts Centre, Marketing Department |
janvier 2008 à avril 2010 | Pas une charge désignée |
Marketing Officer
Canadian Tourism Commission, N/A |
février 2003 à avril 2007 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Director, Media Relations and National Spokesperson
Canada Post Corporation, N/A |
février 2010 à avril 2016 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Writer and Special Advisor
House of Commons, Speaker of the House of Commons, Prime Minster's Office |
1986 à 1993 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Policy Analyst
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, U.S. Bureau |
mai 1994 à octobre 1998 | Pas une charge désignée |