THE CANADIAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION (CMA) IS THE NATIONAL VOICE OF CANADIAN PHYSICIANS. FOUNDED IN 1867, CMA'S MISSION IS TO SERVE AND UNITE THE PHYSICIANS OF CANADA AND BE THE NATIONAL ADVOCATE, IN PARTNERSHIP WITH THE PEOPLE OF CANADA FOR THE HIGHEST STANDARDS OF HEALTH AND HEALTH CARE. ON BEHALF OF ITS MEMBERS AND THE CANADIAN PUBLIC, CMA PERFORMS A WIDE VARIETY OF FUNCTIONS, SUCH AS ADVOCATING HEALTH PROMOTION AND DISEASE/INJURY PREVENTION POLICIES AND STRATEGIES, ADVOCATING FOR ACCESS TO QUALITY HEALTH CARE, FACILITATING CHANGE WITHIN THE MEDICAL PROFESSION, AND PROVIDING LEADERSHIP AND GUIDANCE TO PHYSICIANS TO HELP THEM INFLUENCE, MANAGE AND ADAPT TO CHANGES IN HEALTH CARE DELIVERY.
Paul-Émile Cloutier, Secretary General and Chief Executive Officer
End date of the last completed financial year: 2009-12-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Canadian Heritage (PCH) | $578,331.00 | Yes |
Canadian Institutes of Health Research (CIHR) | $17,897.00 | No |
Health Canada (HC) | $130,766.00 | Yes |
Public Health Agency of Canada (PHAC) | $23,774.00 | No |
Address:
1867 Alta Vista Drive
Ottawa, ON K1G 5W8
Canada
Telephone number:
613-731-8610
Ext.
1241
Fax number:
613-731-1755
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Canadian Medical Association/Association médicale canadienne | 2024-03-01 | current |
Canadian Medical Association/Association médicale canadienne | 2008-10-07 | 2024-03-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Timothy Smith | 2013-12-08 | Current |
Paul-Émile Cloutier | 2009-07-20 | 2013-12-08 |
Barbara Drew | 2008-10-07 | 2009-07-20 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Communications
Minister of Canadian Heritage, Canadian Heritage |
January 1998 to May 2001 | Not a designated office |
Senior Communications advisor
Minister of State and Leader of the Government in the House of Commons, House of Commons |
June 1997 to January 1998 | Not a designated office |
Senior Communications Advisor
Minister's Office, Minister Responsible for CIDA and La Francophonie |
January 1997 to June 1997 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Communications Assistant to the Deputy Speaker
House of Commons, Member of Parliament's Office |
October 2007 to April 2008 | Not a designated office |
Campaign Manager (Canada Workplace Charitable Campaign)
Canadian Food Inspection Agency, Canada Workplace Charitable Campaign |
August 2007 to October 2007 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Communications
Industry Canada, Office of the Minister of State (Fed Economic Initiative for Northern Ontario) |
December 2004 to February 2006 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Program Officer
Health Canada, Division of Aging and Senior |
October 1996 to May 1998 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Policy Advisor
International Affairs, Department of Indian Affairs and Northern Development |
1992 to 1995 | Not a designated office |
Chief of Staff and Senior Advisor
Minister's Office, External Relations and International Development |
1986 to 1992 | Not a designated office |
Executive and Legislation Assistant to the Minister of Immigration, Walter Maclean and Flora MacDonald
Minister's Office, Department of Immigration |
1985 to 1986 | Not a designated office |
Senior Advisor, Industrial Relations
Canada Ports Corporation, Industrial Relations |
1980 to 1985 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
House Leader's Assistant
House of Commons, Federal NDP Caucus |
1993 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Senior Research Officer (Social Policy)
House of Commons, Federal NDP Caucus Research Office |
1991 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant (Health and Social Policy)
House of Commons, Office of Maple Ridge-Pitt Meadow MP |
1988 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant (Fisheries Policy)
House of Commons, Office of Cowichan-Malahat MP |
1986 to 1988 | Not a designated office |
Assistant
House of Commons, Windsor Essex MP |
1984 to 1984 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant (Fisheries Policy)
House of Commons, Office of Comox-Powell River MP |
1984 to 1986 | Not a designated office |
Research Assistant (CPP/OAS and Veterans Affairs Policy)
House of Commons, Office of Winnipeg North Centre MP |
1983 to 1984 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Communications
Minister of Canadian Heritage, Canadian Heritage |
January 1998 to May 2001 | Not a designated office |
Senior Communications advisor
Minister of State and Leader of the Government in the House of Commons, House of Commons |
June 1997 to January 1998 | Not a designated office |
Senior Communications Advisor
Minister's Office, Minister Responsible for CIDA and La Francophonie |
January 1997 to June 1997 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant to the Secretary of State
Industry Canada, Office of the Secretary of State for Science, Research & Development |
August 1995 to November 1995 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant to the Minister
Department of Transport, Minister's Office |
1998 to 2000 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant to the Parliamentary Secretary to the Minister of Justice
House of Commons, Member's Office |
1995 to 1997 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant to the Parliamentary to the Minister of Justice
House of Commons, Member's Office |
1994 to 1995 | Not a designated office |
Scheduling Assistant to the Minister of International Trade
International Trade, Minister's Office |
November 1993 to June 1994 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant to Hon. Jim Peterson
House of Commons, Member's Office |
August 1990 to November 1993 | Not a designated office |
Constituency Assistant to Hon. Warren Allmand, MP
House of Commons, Member's Office |
1990 to August 1990 | Not a designated office |
Receptionist CR-03
External Affairs, Minister's Office |
1987 to 1990 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Canalman
Parks Canada, Rideau Canal |
1986 to 1990 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director General, Acting
Health Canada, Public Health Agency of Canada |
2006 to 2007 | Not a designated office |
Associate Director General
Health Canada, Public Health Agency of Canada/Office for Public Health Practice |
2005 to 2006 | Not a designated office |
Executive Director/Acting
Health Canada, First Nations and Inuit Health Branch |
2004 to 2005 | Not a designated office |
Associate Director
Public Health Agency of Canada, Centre for Infectious Diseases |
2003 to 2004 | Not a designated office |
Chief/Division of Blood Borne Pathogens/medical Specialist Blood Borne Pathogens/Chief Division of HIV/AIDS Surveillance/medical epidemiologist/medical consultant
Health Canada, Laboratory Centre for Disease Control and Federal Centre for AIDS |
1992 to 1998 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Executive Assistant & Office Manager
Joe Jordan, MP, Member of Parliament (Leeds-Grenville |
June 1997 to January 2000 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
Ian Murray, MP, Member of Parliament (Lanark-Carleton) |
September 1994 to June 1997 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
Jim Jordan, MP, Member of Parliament (Leeds-Grenville) |
December 1988 to December 1993 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
Terry Clifford, MP, Member of Parliament (London-Middlesex) |
December 1987 to December 1988 | Not a designated office |
Members Assistant
Bud Bradley, MP, Member of Parliament (Haldimand-Norfolk) |
February 1985 to December 1987 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Manager, Medical Care Information Database
Health Canada, Policy, Communication & Information Branch |
January 1985 to December 1992 | Not a designated office |
Research Officer
Health Canada, Health System Branch |
November 1977 to December 1984 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Consultant, Medical Ethics
Canadian Armed Forces, Not applicable |
July 2003 to August 2003 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Public Affairs
Office of the Leader of the Opposition, Communications |
August 2004 to June 2005 | Not a designated office |
Director of Communications
Office of the Leader of the Opposition, Communications |
July 2002 to July 2004 | Not a designated office |
Director of Communications
Office of the Leader of the Opposition, Communications |
July 1997 to September 2000 | Not a designated office |
Assistant Director of Media Relations
Office of the Leader of the Reform Party, Media Relations |
April 1995 to July 1997 | Not a designated office |
Communication Officer
Office of the Leader of the Reform Party, Communications |
April 1994 to April 1995 | Not a designated office |
Communications Consultant
Department of Foreign Affairs, Communications |
September 1992 to March 1994 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Acting Chief, National Hospital Productivity & Promotion Branch
Health & Welfare Canada, Health Services & Promotion Branch |
December 1983 to March 1990 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Research Analyst, Senior Research Analyst
Statistics Canada, Health Division |
September 1978 to October 1990 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Statistical Analyst (University co-op placement)
Industry Canada, Automotive & Transportation Division |
1997 to 1997 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director General
Health Canada, Office of Health and the Information Highway |
2000 to 2002 | Not a designated office |
Regional Director General
Health Canada, Central Region |
1993 to 2000 | Not a designated office |
Director General
Health and Welfare Canada, Communications |
1991 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Director of Operations and Communications
Privy Council Office, Communications Secretariat |
1988 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
Executive Director
Health and Welfare Canada, Celebration 88 |
1987 to 1988 | Not a designated office |
Director of Evaluation
Transport Canada, Evaluation |
1986 to 1987 | Not a designated office |
Executive Director
Transport Canada, Federal Coordination Secretariat - Expo 86 |
1985 to 1986 | Not a designated office |
Director Policy, Planning and Finance
Transport Canada, Water Transportation Assistance Directorate, Surface Administration |
1981 to 1983 | Not a designated office |
Regional Director Air Planning and Programming
Transport Canada, Air Administration |
1974 to 1980 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Economist
Parks Canada, Policy and analysis branch |
September 2003 to 2003 | Not a designated office |
Senior Economist
Transport Canada, Policy and analysis branch |
May 2002 to June 2002 | Not a designated office |
Senior Economist
Department of Finance, Forecasting Branch, Consulting work |
September 2001 to October 2001 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legal Counsel
Department of Justice, Indian Affairs and Northern Development |
January 1999 to February 2000 | Not a designated office |
Law Clerk to Federal Court Trial Division Judge, Hon. Max M. Teitelbaum
Federal Court of Canada, Federal Court Trial Division Judge, Hon. Max M. Teitelbaum |
September 1996 to August 1997 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
A/Chief, Cardiovascular Disease Section
Bureau of Cardio Respiratory Diseases and Diabetes, Laboratory Centre for Disease Control (LCDC), Health Protection Branch |
May 2000 to April 2002 | Not a designated office |
Epidemiologist
Bureau of Cardio Respiratory Diseases and Diabetes, Laboratory Centre for Disease Control (LCDC), Health Protection Branch |
November 1999 to May 2000 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Administrative Assistant
Department of Foreign Affairs, Not applicable |
May 1996 to June 1996 | Not a designated office |
Administrative Assistant
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Office of Protocol |
February 1995 to May 1995 | Not a designated office |
Administrative Assistant
Department of Human Resources Development Canada, Taskforce on Social Security Reform |
September 1994 to January 1995 | Not a designated office |
Senior Administrative Assistant
Department of Foreign Affairs, Cultural Affairs and Higher Education Bureau |
April 1993 to April 1994 | Not a designated office |
Administrative Assistant
Federal Court of Canada, Trial Division |
November 1992 to December 1992 | Not a designated office |
Secretary to director general
External Affairs Canada, International Migration |
July 1992 to September 1992 | Not a designated office |
Assistant project coordinator
Forestry Canada, National Advisory Committee on Model Forests, Science & Sustainable Development |
February 1992 to April 1992 | Not a designated office |
Secretary to the director
Forestry Canada, Forest Health Research |
July 1991 to February 1992 | Not a designated office |
Consultant (Synergem management consultants)
Supply and Services Canada, Public Service Compensation System Project |
March 1990 to April 1991 | Not a designated office |