The DGC is a national labour organization representing key creative and logistical workers in 47 employment categories in the film, television and new media industry.
Brian Anthony, National Executive Director and CEO
Address:
111 Peter Street, Suite 402,
Toronto, ON M5R 3R7
Canada
Telephone number:
416-482-6640
Ext.
223
Fax number:
416-482-6639
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Directors Guild of Canada/La guilde canadienne des realisateurs | 2024-09-18 | current |
Directors Guild of Canada/La guilde canadienne des realisateurs | 2008-10-17 | 2024-09-18 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Dave Forget | 2018-07-01 | Current |
Brian Baker | 2014-04-30 | 2018-07-01 |
Gerry Barr | 2011-08-02 | 2014-04-30 |
Brian Anthony | 2008-10-17 | 2011-06-02 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Associate Director
Canada Council for the Arts, None |
April 1992 to November 1995 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Associate Director
Canada Council for the Arts, None |
April 1992 to November 1995 | Not a designated office |