Food & Consumer Products of Canada (FCPC) is the largest industry association in Canada representing the food and consumer products industry.
Michael Graydon, Chief Executive Officer
Address:
2700 Matheson Blvd. East, East Tower, Suite 602E
Toronto, ON L4W 4V9
Canada
Telephone number:
613-670-5759
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Food, Health & Consumer Products of Canada/Produits alimentaires, de santé et de consommation du Canada | 2024-05-14 | current |
Food, Health & Consumer Products of Canada/Produits alimentaires, de santé et de consommation du Canada | 2020-09-01 | 2024-05-14 |
FOOD AND CONSUMER PRODUCTS OF CANADA/Produits alimentaires et de consommation du Canada | 2009-04-07 | 2020-09-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Michael Graydon | 2016-07-04 | Current |
NANCY CROITORU | 2003-11-04 | 2016-07-04 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Director of Communications
Department of Infrasturcture and Communities, The Hon. John Godfrey's Office, Minister of State Infrastructure and Communities |
août 2004 à février 2006 | Pas une charge désignée |
Director of Commuications/Press Secretary
Department of Agricluture and Agri-Food, The Hon. Bob Speller's Office, Minister of Agriculture |
février 2004 à juillet 2004 | Pas une charge désignée |