Food, Health & Consumer Products of Canada (FHCP) is the largest industry association in Canada representing the food, health and consumer products industry. Food & Consumer Products of Canada (FCPC) has changed its name to Food, Health & Consumer Products of Canada (FHCP) effective September 1, 2020. Consumer Health Products Canada (CHP Canada) amalgamated with Food & Consumer Products of Canada (FCPC) as of September 1, 2020.
Michael Graydon, Chief Executive Officer
Address:
2700 Matheson Blvd. East, East Tower, Suite 602E
Toronto, ON L4W 4V9
Canada
Telephone number:
613-723-0777
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Food, Health & Consumer Products of Canada/Produits alimentaires, de santé et de consommation du Canada | 2024-05-14 | current |
Food, Health & Consumer Products of Canada/Produits alimentaires, de santé et de consommation du Canada | 2020-09-01 | 2024-05-14 |
FOOD AND CONSUMER PRODUCTS OF CANADA/Produits alimentaires et de consommation du Canada | 2009-04-07 | 2020-09-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Michael Graydon | 2016-07-04 | Current |
NANCY CROITORU | 2003-11-04 | 2016-07-04 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director
Natural Resources Canada, Office of Energy Efficiency |
July 2016 to January 2020 | Not a designated office |
Director
Health Canada, Health Products and Food Branch |
September 2011 to July 2016 | Not a designated office |
Acting Executive Advisor
Health Canada, Deputy Minister’s Office |
December 2010 to September 2011 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor
Health Canada, Healthy Environments and Consumer Safety Branch |
June 2009 to December 2010 | Not a designated office |
Acting Director
Health Canada, Healthy Environments and Consumer Safety Branch |
September 2008 to May 2009 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor
Health Canada, Healthy Environments and Consumer Safety Branch |
January 2006 to August 2008 | Not a designated office |
Policy and Program Advisor
Health Canada, Healthy Environments and Consumer Safety Branch |
September 2004 to December 2005 | Not a designated office |
Policy Analyst
Health Canada, Healthy Environments and Consumer Safety Branch |
May 2003 to September 2004 | Not a designated office |
Policy Analyst
Human Resources Development Canada, Social Policy Development |
May 2001 to May 2003 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
ATI Regulatory Analyst
Health Canada, Resource Management and Operations Directorate - RMOD |
January 2016 to May 2016 | Not a designated office |
Canadian Forces Health Services Assistant
Department of National Defense, Montfort Hospital Physiotherapy Unit |
January 2014 to January 2016 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Communications
Department of Infrasturcture and Communities, The Hon. John Godfrey's Office, Minister of State Infrastructure and Communities |
August 2004 to February 2006 | Not a designated office |
Director of Commuications/Press Secretary
Department of Agricluture and Agri-Food, The Hon. Bob Speller's Office, Minister of Agriculture |
February 2004 to July 2004 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director
Natural Resources Canada, Office of Energy Efficiency |
July 2016 to January 2020 | Not a designated office |
Director
Health Canada, Health Products and Food Branch |
September 2011 to July 2016 | Not a designated office |
Acting Executive Advisor
Health Canada, Deputy Minister’s Office |
December 2010 to September 2011 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor
Health Canada, Healthy Environments and Consumer Safety Branch |
June 2009 to December 2010 | Not a designated office |
Acting Director
Health Canada, Healthy Environments and Consumer Safety Branch |
September 2008 to May 2009 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor
Health Canada, Healthy Environments and Consumer Safety Branch |
January 2006 to August 2008 | Not a designated office |
Policy and Program Advisor
Health Canada, Healthy Environments and Consumer Safety Branch |
September 2004 to December 2005 | Not a designated office |
Policy Analyst
Health Canada, Healthy Environments and Consumer Safety Branch |
May 2003 to September 2004 | Not a designated office |
Policy Analyst
Human Resources Development Canada, Social Policy Development |
May 2001 to May 2003 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Terry Beech, MP |
February 2020 to November 2021 | Not a designated office |