Mitacs' programs focus on developing the next generation of Canadian researchers through skills enhancement workshops, technical training events, graduate and post-doctoral internships and math outreach activities. Through our graduate and post-doctoral internship programs, Mitacs has expanded its mandate to lead the country in the creation of internships in all industry sectors and academic disciplines. Mitacs helps businesses and organizations access advanced university expertise so that they can commercialize their R&D into products and services.
John Hepburn, Chief Executive Officer and Scientific Director
Date de la fin du dernier exercice financier complet : 2019-03-31
Institution gouvernementale | Financement reçu au cours du dernier exercice financier | Financement attendu pendant l'exercice financier en cours |
---|---|---|
Environnement et Changement climatique Canada (ECCC) | 249 750,00 $ | Oui |
Innovation, Sciences et Développement économique Canada (ISDE) | 65 650 814,00 $ | Oui |
Ressources naturelles Canada (RNCan) | 732 680,00 $ | Oui |
Diversification de l'économie de l'Ouest Canada (DEO) | 412 500,00 $ | Oui |
Adresse :
Suite 301, Technology Enterprise Facility
University of British Columbia, 6190 Agronomy Road
Vancouver, BC V6T 1Z3
Canada
Numéro de téléphone :
604-822-9189
Ceci est le nom de l'agent responsable tel qu'indiqué dans l'enregistrement le plus récent de l'entreprise ou de l'organisation.
Nom | De | à |
---|---|---|
Mitacs Inc. | 2024-01-29 | actuel |
Mitacs Inc. | 2011-08-17 | 2024-01-29 |
MITACS | 2009-01-01 | 2011-08-17 |
Nom de l'agent responsable | De (aaaa-mm-jj) | À (aaaa-mm-jj) |
---|---|---|
John Hepburn | 2020-02-18 | Actuel |
Jennifer Wilkie | 2019-09-27 | 2020-02-18 |
Alejandro Adem | 2015-02-01 | 2019-09-27 |
Robert Annan | 2014-07-01 | 2015-02-01 |
Arvind Gupta | 2009-01-01 | 2014-07-01 |
Les déclarants sont tenus de soumettre un rapport mensuel de communications pour chaque communication orale et organisée avec un titulaire de charge publique désignée. Le nom du plus haut dirigeant rémunéré (c.-à-d. le déclarant) figurera sur tous les rapports mensuels de communications des lobbyistes salariés, que cette personne ait participé ou non aux communications.
Note :Les rapports mensuels de communications sont dus le 15e jour de chaque mois pour les communications qui ont eu lieu le mois précédent.
Les résultats ci-dessous sont triés par la date de publication au Registre des lobbyistes en ordre chronologique décroissant.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director, Strategic Contributions
Innovation Science and Economic Development Canada, Science and Research Sector |
April 2017 to September 2018 | Not a designated office |
Director, Science Partnerships
Industry Canada, Science and Innovation Sector |
2012 to 2017 | Not a designated office |
Director, Knowledge Infrastructure Program
Industry Canada, Science and Innovation Sector |
2009 to 2012 | Not a designated office |
Chief, Science Policy
Industry Canada, Innovation Policy Branch |
1999 to 2009 | Not a designated office |
Manager, Policy and Innovation
Industry Canada, Aboriginal Business Canada |
1993 to 1999 | Not a designated office |
Senior Industry, Trade and Technology Officer
Department of Regional Industrial Expansion, Manitoba Regional Office |
1988 to 1993 | Not a designated office |
Defence Scientist
Department of National Defence, Vehicle Mobility Sector |
1982 to 1988 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant Office of the Deputy Prime Minister, Policy and Research
Office of the Deputy Prime Minister, Policy and Research |
February 2003 to October 2003 | Not a designated office |
Program and Policy Advisor Office of the Secretary to the Governor General, Program and Policy
Office of the Secretary to the Governor General, Program and Policy |
January 2002 to November 2002 | Not a designated office |
Communications Advisor
Fisheries and Oceans, Aquaculture |
August 2001 to December 2001 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor
HRDC, Learning and Literacy Secretariat |
January 2001 to July 2001 | Not a designated office |