TRIUMF is Canada's particle accelerator centre.
Jonathan Bagger, Director
End date of the last completed financial year: 2018-03-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Infrastructure Canada (INFC) | $0.00 | Yes |
National Research Council (NRC) | $54,572,800.00 | Yes |
Natural Sciences and Engineering Research Council (NSERC) | $5,301,174.00 | Yes |
Address:
4004 Wesbrook Mall
Vancouver, BC V6T 2A3
Canada
Telephone number:
604-222-7490
Fax number:
604-222-3791
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
TRIUMF | 2024-04-01 | current |
TRIUMF | 2008-02-15 | 2024-04-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Nigel Smith | 2021-05-17 | Current |
Digvir Jayas | 2021-01-01 | 2021-05-17 |
Jonathan Bagger | 2014-07-01 | 2021-01-01 |
James Hanlon | 2013-09-03 | 2014-07-01 |
Nigel Lockyer | 2008-02-15 | 2013-09-03 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Office Administrator
Canadian Embassy in Mexico, Trade Section |
October 2001 to February 2003 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Innovation Officer
Department of Foreign Affairs, Trade and Development, International Trade |
April 2013 to April 2014 | Not a designated office |
Policy Analyst
Department of Foreign Affairs, Trade and Development, International Trade |
April 2011 to April 2013 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Office Administrator
Canadian Embassy in Mexico, Trade Section |
October 2001 to February 2003 | Not a designated office |