Total Number of Communication Reports: 201
Monthly communication reports in the last 6 months: 0
CANADA'S 75,000 CERTIFIED GENERAL ACCOUNTANTS AND CGA STUDENTS ARE REPRESENTED NATIONALLY THROUGH CGA-CANADA AND REGIONALLY THROUGH THEIR PROVINCIAL AND LOCAL AFFILIATES. THE NATIONAL BODY GIVES THE ASSOCIATION ITS UNITY AND STRENGTH, WHILE ENSURING UNIFORM EDUCATIONAL AND PROFESSIONAL STANDARDS ACROSS CANADA.
ANTHONY ARIGANELLO, PRESIDENT & CHIEF EXECUTIVE OFFICER
End date of the last completed financial year: 2012-06-30
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Human Resources and Skills Development Canada (HRSDC) | $365,000.00 | Yes |
Address:
100 - 4200 North Fraser Way
Burnaby, BC V5J 5K7
Canada
Telephone number:
604-605-5006
Fax number:
604-683-6483
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Certified General Accountants Association of Canada/Association des comptables généraux accrédités du Canada | 2008-08-14 | 2014-09-30 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Lyle Handfield | 2014-05-30 | 2014-09-30 |
ANTHONY ARIGANELLO | 2003-11-17 | 2014-05-30 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Policy Analyst
Transport Canada, Security and Emergency Preparedness |
January 2007 to April 2007 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor
Finance, Office of the Mnister |
December 2003 to January 2006 | Not a designated office |
Caucus Liaison
Public Works and Government Services, Office of the Minister |
October 2002 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant
House of Commons, Office of the MP for Chatham-Kent Essex |
September 1997 to October 2002 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Office of the Member for Burin-St. George's |
January 1991 to June 1997 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Senate, Office of the Late Hon. Paul Lucier |
1988 to 1989 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Executive Assistant
Energy, Mines & Resources, Office of the Minister |
November 1982 to June 1983 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Justice, Office of the Minister |
February 1980 to November 1982 | Not a designated office |
Assistant
House of Commons, Office of the MP for Shawinigan |
May 1979 to February 1980 | Not a designated office |
Assistant
Finance, Office of the Minister |
June 1978 to May 1979 | Not a designated office |