CANADIAN CANCER SOCIETY IS A REGISTERED CHARITY INCORPORATED UNDER THE CANADA CORPORATIONS ACT AS A NON-PROFIT ORGANIZATION WITHOUT SHARE CAPITAL. THE SOCIETY IS A NATIONAL, COMMUNITY-BASED ORGANIZATION OF VOLUNTEERS, WHOSE MISSION IS THE ERADICATION OF CANCER AND THE ENHANCEMENT OF THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF PEOPLE LIVING WITH CANCER. THE CANADIAN CANCER SOCIETY, IN PARTNERSHIP WITH THE NATIONAL CANCER INSTITUTE OF CANADA, ACHIEVES ITS MISSION THROUGH RESEARCH, EDUCATION, PATIENT SERVICES AND ADVOCACY FOR HEALTHY PUBLIC POLICY. THESE EFFORTS ARE SUPPORTED BY VOLUNTEERS AND STAFF, AND FUNDS RAISED IN COMMUNITIES ACROSS CANADA.
PETER GOODHAND, CEO
End date of the last completed financial year: 2011-01-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Health Canada (HC) | $416,131.00 | Yes |
Human Resources and Skills Development Canada (HRSDC) | $159,627.00 | No |
Public Health Agency of Canada (PHAC) | $226,152.19 | Yes |
Service Canada (ServCan) | $34,272.00 | Yes |
Address:
55 St. Claire Ave W, Suite 300
TORONTO, ON M4V 2Y7
Canada
Telephone number:
416-961-7223
Fax number:
416-961-4189
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
CANADIAN CANCER SOCIETY/Société canadienne du cancer | 2024-04-08 | current |
CANADIAN CANCER SOCIETY/Société canadienne du cancer | 2008-08-13 | 2024-04-08 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Andrea Seale | 2019-03-01 | Current |
Lynne Hudson | 2016-10-25 | 2019-03-01 |
Anne Vézina | 2016-04-15 | 2016-10-25 |
Pamela Fralick | 2013-01-07 | 2016-04-15 |
Anne Vézina | 2012-06-18 | 2013-01-07 |
PETER GOODHAND | 2009-06-11 | 2012-06-18 |
BARBARA WHYLIE | 2003-11-17 | 2009-06-11 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Researcher
chambre des communes, NDP |
December 2008 to September 2010 | Not a designated office |
Assistant
Chambre des communes, NDP |
May 2006 to December 2008 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director, Strategic Initiatives
National Research Council of Canada, Executive Office |
2003 to 2006 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant to the Secretary of State
Department of Finance, Minister's Office |
2003 to 2003 | Not a designated office |
Executive Assistant to the Secretary of State - Science, Research and Development
Industry Canada, Minister's Office |
2002 to 2002 | Not a designated office |
Director, Strategic Support
National Research Council of Canada, Executive Office |
1998 to 2002 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Professional development network coordinator
Citizenship and Immigration Canada, Corporate Services |
September 2011 to December 2011 | Not a designated office |
documents coordinator
Environment Canada, Meteorological services of Canada |
January 2011 to April 2011 | Not a designated office |
Junior communication officer
Indian and Northern Affairs Canada, Communication Branch |
May 2010 to August 2010 | Not a designated office |
Service desk agent
HRSDC, IITB |
May 2009 to August 2009 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Correspondence Assistant (summer student)
House of Commons, Office of the Leader of the Opposition |
May 1986 to August 1986 | Not a designated office |
Correspondence Assistant (summer student)
House of Commons, Office of the Leader of the Opposition |
May 1985 to August 1985 | Not a designated office |