Health Research Charity
John McKee, President and Chief Executive Officer
Address:
2550 Victoria Park Ave Suite 800
Toronto, ON M2J 5A9
Canada
Telephone number:
647-789-2000
Ext.
2008
Fax number:
416-491-2111
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Juvenile Diabetes Research Foundation/Fondation de la recherche sur le diabète juvénile | 2024-05-24 | current |
Juvenile Diabetes Research Foundation/Fondation de la recherche sur le diabète juvénile | 2009-05-20 | 2024-05-24 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Jessica Diniz | 2023-11-01 | Current |
Dave Prowten | 2014-01-01 | 2023-11-01 |
John McKee | 2009-05-20 | 2013-11-02 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Parliamentary Briefing Officer
Department of the Solicitor General, Coordination & Liason |
September 2001 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Office of Lynn Myers, MP, House of Commons |
January 2001 to September 2001 | Not a designated office |