Total Number of Communication Reports: 259
Monthly communication reports in the last 6 months: 0
Provider of advanced information solutions that capture and process vast amounts of data, produce essential information and improve the decision making and operational peformance of business and govenrment organizations worldwide. Provider of a broad spectrum of earth and space based information solutions, ranging from complex operational systems, to customized information services.
Stephen Oldham, General Manager, Satellites and Robotics
Address:
13800 Commerce Parkway
Richmond, BC V6V 2J3
Canada
Telephone number:
604-231-2042
Fax number:
604-231-2759
MDA Systems Ltd. does not have any subsidiaries that could have a direct interest in the outcome of the undertaking
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
MDA Systems Ltd. | 2009-07-15 | 2018-09-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Mike Greenley | 2018-03-01 | 2018-09-01 |
Hiten Makim | 2017-11-01 | 2018-03-01 |
Donald Osborne | 2014-03-01 | 2017-11-01 |
David Caddey | 2012-11-01 | 2014-03-01 |
David Hargreaves | 2011-09-09 | 2012-11-01 |
Stephen Oldham | 2009-07-15 | 2011-09-09 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Major
Canadian Armed Forces, Comox Base VP407 Sqn. |
July 1983 to July 1986 | Not a designated office |
Major
National Defence HQ, Adm./Mat/DGAEM |
July 1980 to June 1983 | Not a designated office |
Captain
National Defence HQ, Adm./Mat/DGAEM |
July 1976 to June 1980 | Not a designated office |
Captain
Canadian Armed Forces, Royal Military College Graduate Student |
July 1973 to June 1976 | Not a designated office |
Lieutenant
Canadian Armed Forces, Edmonton Air Force Base |
June 1971 to June 1973 | Not a designated office |
Officer
Canadian Armed Forces, Varied |
June 1971 to July 1986 | Not a designated office |