Total Number of Communication Reports: 259
Monthly communication reports in the last 6 months: 0
Provider of advanced information solutions that capture and process vast amounts of data, produce essential information and improve the decision making and operational peformance of business and govenrment organizations worldwide. Provider of a broad spectrum of earth and space based information solutions, ranging from complex operational systems, to customized information services.
Donald Osborne, Executive Vice President and General Manager
End date of the last completed financial year: 2013-12-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Atlantic Canada Opportunities Agency (ACOA) | $229,673.53 | Yes |
Address:
13800 Commerce Parkway
Richmond, BC V6V 2J3
Canada
Telephone number:
514-425-3006
Fax number:
514-425-3001
MDA Systems Ltd. does not have any subsidiaries that could have a direct interest in the outcome of the undertaking
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
MDA Systems Ltd. | 2009-07-15 | 2018-09-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Mike Greenley | 2018-03-01 | 2018-09-01 |
Hiten Makim | 2017-11-01 | 2018-03-01 |
Donald Osborne | 2014-03-01 | 2017-11-01 |
David Caddey | 2012-11-01 | 2014-03-01 |
David Hargreaves | 2011-09-09 | 2012-11-01 |
Stephen Oldham | 2009-07-15 | 2011-09-09 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chief of Staff
Federal Government, Office of the Leader of the Opposition |
May 2003 to September 2005 | Not a designated office |
Deputy Chief of Staff
Federal Government, Leader of the Opposition |
May 2002 to May 2003 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
Federal Government, Opposition House Leader's Office |
September 1994 to May 2002 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chief of Staff
Federal Government, Office of the Leader of the Opposition |
May 2003 to September 2005 | Not a designated office |
Deputy Chief of Staff
Federal Government, Leader of the Opposition |
May 2002 to May 2003 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
Federal Government, Opposition House Leader's Office |
September 1994 to May 2002 | Not a designated office |