Capital Power Corporation has interests in developing, acquiring, operating and optimizing power generation from a diverse range of energy sources.
Brian Vaasjo, President and Chief Executive Officer
End date of the last completed financial year: 2008-12-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Natural Resources Canada (NRCan) | $2,274,340.00 | Yes |
Address:
10088 – 102 Avenue
Edmonton, AB T5J 2Z1
Canada
Telephone number:
780-392-5156
Capital Power Corporation is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Capital Power Corporation | 2024-04-01 | current |
Capital Power Corporation | 2009-07-14 | 2024-04-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Avik Dey | 2023-05-08 | Current |
Brian Vaasjo | 2009-07-14 | 2023-05-08 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Executive Assistant
Ministers Office, Western Economic Development |
June 1993 to November 1993 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor
Ministers Office, International trade and Industry, science and technology |
January 1993 to February 1993 | Not a designated office |
PC Caucus services
PC Caucus, Western Desk |
June 1992 to January 1993 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Ministers office, International trade and Industry, science and technology |
September 1991 to June 1992 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Second Lieutenant
Defense, Air Force |
May 1995 to May 2000 | Not a designated office |
Officer Cadet
Defense, Royal Military College |
August 1991 to May 1995 | Not a designated office |