As a non-profit trade association, the CMPA represents almost 400 film, television and interactive media companies across the country. We negotiate and manage labour agreements, and actively lobby the federal and provincial governments on various policy areas including taxation, trade, copyright, broadcasting and film. Our National Mentorship Program trains young people to meet the demands of this evolving industry. The association also holds an annual networking conference, Prime Time in Ottawa, where we release Profile, our state of the industry report featuring the industry's most comprehensive statistics. We also publish an online GUIDE, Canada's production industry directory. With offices in Ottawa, Toronto and Vancouver, the CMPA is always there for the independent Canadian producer.
MICHAEL HENNESSY, President and Chief Executive Officer
End date of the last completed financial year: 2013-03-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Human Resources and Skills Development Canada (HRSDC) | $15,000.00 | Yes |
Telefilm Canada | $82,500.00 | Yes |
Address:
601 Bank Street
Second Floor
Ottawa, ON K1S 3T4
Canada
Telephone number:
613-232-2631
Ext.
613
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Canadian Media Producers Association/Association canadienne des producteurs médiatiques. | 2024-04-09 | current |
Canadian Media Producers Association/Association canadienne des producteurs médiatiques. | 2016-02-22 | 2024-04-09 |
Canadian Media Production Association/Association canadienne de production de média | 2010-08-12 | 2016-02-22 |
Canadian Film and Television Production Association (CFTPA)/Association canadienne de production de films et de télévision (ACPFT) | 2008-07-02 | 2010-08-12 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Reynolds Mastin | 2015-07-30 | Current |
MICHAEL HENNESSY | 2012-06-18 | 2015-07-30 |
Norm Bolen | 2009-04-15 | 2012-06-18 |
John Barrack | 2009-02-26 | 2009-04-15 |
GUY MAYSON | 2004-01-15 | 2009-02-26 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislative/Communications Assistant
House of Commons, Ray Boughen, M.P. |
December 2008 to December 2010 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Manager, Film and Video Policy and Programs
Department of Canadian Heritage, Film and Video Policy and Programs |
May 2003 to August 2004 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Analyst
Policy Analyst, Broadcasting |
January 1988 to August 1989 | Not a designated office |
Decision Writer
Candian Radio-television and Telecommunications Commission, Broadcasting |
July 1987 to December 1987 | Not a designated office |
Legal Counsel
Canadian Radio-television and Telecommunications Commission, Legal Directorate |
January 1987 to June 1987 | Not a designated office |
Law Student
Canadian Radio-television and Telecommunications Commission, Legal Directorate |
July 1986 to December 1986 | Not a designated office |
Articling Student
Canadian Radio-television and Telecommunications Commission, Legal Directorate |
July 1985 to July 1986 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
A/Manager, Business and Legal Affairs
Department of Canadian Heritage, CAVCO |
February 1998 to April 2002 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legal Counsel and Articling Student
CRTC, Legal Directorate |
September 2005 to July 2006 | Not a designated office |
Student Employment Officer
Human Resource Development Canada, Student Employment Office |
May 2002 to August 2002 | Not a designated office |
Parliamentary Guide
Parliament of Canada, Library of Parliament |
May 1998 to May 1999 | Not a designated office |
Student Employment Officer
Human Resources Development Canada, Student Employment Office |
May 1997 to August 1997 | Not a designated office |
Official Languages Monitor
Department of Canadian Heritage, Official Languages Branch |
September 1996 to May 1997 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Judicial Law Clerk
Federal Court of Canada, Courts Administration Service |
August 2008 to July 2009 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director
Telefilm Canada, Television Unit, Vancouver Office |
January 1996 to September 1996 | Not a designated office |
Manager, Business Affairs
Telefilm Canada, Vancouver Office |
January 1990 to December 1995 | Not a designated office |
Business Affairs Analyst
Telefilm Canada, Vancouver Office |
June 1989 to December 1989 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislative/Communications Assistant
House of Commons, Ray Boughen, M.P. |
December 2008 to December 2010 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director General, Competition, Convergeance and Social Policy
CRTC, Telecommunications |
September 1981 to November 1994 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Communications
Parliament of Canada, Office of Irwin Cotler, Member of Paliament |
January 2006 to February 2006 | Not a designated office |
Director of Communications
Ministry of Justice, Office of the Minister of Justice |
November 2005 to December 2005 | Not a designated office |