As a non-profit trade association, the CMPA represents almost 400 film, television and interactive media companies across the country. We negotiate and manage labour agreements, and actively lobby the federal and provincial governments on various policy areas including taxation, trade, copyright, broadcasting and film. Our National Mentorship Program trains young people to meet the demands of this evolving industry. The association also holds an annual networking conference, Prime Time in Ottawa, where we release Profile, our state of the industry report featuring the industry's most comprehensive statistics. We also publish an online GUIDE, Canada's production industry directory. With offices in Ottawa, Toronto and Vancouver, the CMPA is always there for the independent Canadian producer.
Norm Bolen, President and Chief Executive Officer
End date of the last completed financial year: 2012-03-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Human Resources and Skills Development Canada (HRSDC) | $275,829.00 | Yes |
Address:
601 Bank Street
Second Floor
Ottawa, ON K1S 3T4
Canada
Telephone number:
613-233-1444
Ext.
328
Fax number:
613-233-0073
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Canadian Media Producers Association/Association canadienne des producteurs médiatiques. | 2024-04-09 | current |
Canadian Media Producers Association/Association canadienne des producteurs médiatiques. | 2016-02-22 | 2024-04-09 |
Canadian Media Production Association/Association canadienne de production de média | 2010-08-12 | 2016-02-22 |
Canadian Film and Television Production Association (CFTPA)/Association canadienne de production de films et de télévision (ACPFT) | 2008-07-02 | 2010-08-12 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Reynolds Mastin | 2015-07-30 | Current |
MICHAEL HENNESSY | 2012-06-18 | 2015-07-30 |
Norm Bolen | 2009-04-15 | 2012-06-18 |
John Barrack | 2009-02-26 | 2009-04-15 |
GUY MAYSON | 2004-01-15 | 2009-02-26 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Manager, Film and Video Policy and Programs
Department of Canadian Heritage, Film and Video Policy and Programs |
mai 2003 à août 2004 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Policy Analyst
Policy Analyst, Broadcasting |
janvier 1988 à août 1989 | Pas une charge désignée |
Decision Writer
Candian Radio-television and Telecommunications Commission, Broadcasting |
juillet 1987 à décembre 1987 | Pas une charge désignée |
Legal Counsel
Canadian Radio-television and Telecommunications Commission, Legal Directorate |
janvier 1987 à juin 1987 | Pas une charge désignée |
Law Student
Canadian Radio-television and Telecommunications Commission, Legal Directorate |
juillet 1986 à décembre 1986 | Pas une charge désignée |
Articling Student
Canadian Radio-television and Telecommunications Commission, Legal Directorate |
juillet 1985 à juillet 1986 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Legal Counsel and Articling Student
CRTC, Legal Directorate |
septembre 2005 à juillet 2006 | Pas une charge désignée |
Student Employment Officer
Human Resource Development Canada, Student Employment Office |
mai 2002 à août 2002 | Pas une charge désignée |
Parliamentary Guide
Parliament of Canada, Library of Parliament |
mai 1998 à mai 1999 | Pas une charge désignée |
Student Employment Officer
Human Resources Development Canada, Student Employment Office |
mai 1997 à août 1997 | Pas une charge désignée |
Official Languages Monitor
Department of Canadian Heritage, Official Languages Branch |
septembre 1996 à mai 1997 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Judicial Law Clerk
Federal Court of Canada, Courts Administration Service |
août 2008 à juillet 2009 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
A/Manager, Business and Legal Affairs
Department of Canadian Heritage, CAVCO |
février 1998 à avril 2002 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Director
Telefilm Canada, Television Unit, Vancouver Office |
janvier 1996 à septembre 1996 | Pas une charge désignée |
Manager, Business Affairs
Telefilm Canada, Vancouver Office |
janvier 1990 à décembre 1995 | Pas une charge désignée |
Business Affairs Analyst
Telefilm Canada, Vancouver Office |
juin 1989 à décembre 1989 | Pas une charge désignée |
Poste | Période d'occupation | Date du dernier jour d'occupation de la charge publique désignée |
---|---|---|
Director of Communications
Parliament of Canada, Office of Irwin Cotler, Member of Paliament |
janvier 2006 à février 2006 | Pas une charge désignée |
Director of Communications
Ministry of Justice, Office of the Minister of Justice |
novembre 2005 à décembre 2005 | Pas une charge désignée |