Cenovus Energy is a Canadian oil company. We are committed to applying fresh, progressive thinking to safely and responsibly unlock energy resources the world needs. Our operations include oil sands projects in northern Alberta, which use specialized methods to drill and pump the oil to the surface, and established natural gas and oil production in Alberta and Saskatchewan. We also have 50 percent ownership in two U.S. refineries.
Brian Ferguson, President and Chief Executive Officer
Address:
421-7 Avenue SW
PO Box 766
Calgary, AB T2P 0M5
Canada
Telephone number:
403-766-2000
Fax number:
403-766-7600
Cenovus Energy Inc. is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Cenovus Energy Inc. | 2024-04-15 | current |
Cenovus Energy Inc. | 2010-01-21 | 2024-04-15 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Jonathan McKenzie | 2023-04-26 | Current |
Alex Pourbaix | 2017-11-06 | 2023-04-26 |
Brian Ferguson | 2010-01-21 | 2017-11-02 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chief of Library & Information Services
External Affairs, Canadian Consulate General NY |
June 1980 to May 1985 | Not a designated office |
Assistant Librarian
External Affairs, Canadian Consulate General NY |
January 1979 to June 1980 | Not a designated office |