Xplornet uses the latest equipment from some of the world's leading technology companies. This allows us to deliver high-speed Internet service that is fast, reliable and affordable to home, business and enterprise users. The combination of using two service delivery platforms - fixed wireless and satellite - allows us to reach suburban, rural and remote customers who would otherwise have no access to affordable high-speed Internet.
Allison Lenehan, President & CEO
End date of the last completed financial year: 2017-12-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Federal Economic Development Agency for Southern Ontario (FedDev) | $34,374.45 | No |
Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada (ISED) | $3,074,918.00 | Yes |
Le ministre des Affaires municipales et de l'Occupation du territoire. | $184,000.00 | No |
Province of New Brunswick | $900,200.00 | Yes |
Province of Ontario - Eastern Ontario Development Fund (EODF) | $47,140.00 | Yes |
Address:
625 Cochrane Drive, Suite 1000
Markham, ON L3R 9R9
Canada
Telephone number:
905-513-9757
Fax number:
905-513-0443
Xplornet Communications Inc. is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Xplore Inc./ | 2024-05-14 | current |
Xplore Inc./ | 2022-11-11 | 2024-05-14 |
Xplornet Communications Inc. | 2011-08-17 | 2022-11-11 |
Barrett Xplore | 2010-04-22 | 2011-08-17 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Geoff Lowe | 2024-06-22 | Current |
Rizwan Jamal | 2023-09-05 | 2024-06-22 |
Francis Shammo | 2023-02-21 | 2023-09-05 |
Allison Lenehan | 2013-01-07 | 2023-02-21 |
John Maduri | 2010-04-22 | 2013-01-07 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chief of Staff
Industry Canada, Minister's Office |
July 2013 to November 2015 | November 3, 2015 |
Chief of Staff
Department of Canadian Heritage, Minister's Office |
July 2012 to July 2013 | July 15, 2013 |
Director of Communications
Department of Canadian Heritage, Minister's office |
December 2011 to July 2012 | July 9, 2012 |
Director of Parliamentary Affairs
Department of Canadian Heritage, Minister's office |
July 2009 to December 2011 | December 5, 2011 |
Director of Issues Management; Acting Chief of Staff
Natural Resources Canada, Minister's Office |
November 2008 to July 2009 | July 17, 2009 |
Senior Policy Advisor
Human Resources and Social Development Canada, Office of the Minister of State |
January 2007 to November 2008 | November 21, 2008 |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chief of Staff
Industry Canada, Minister's Office |
July 2013 to November 2015 | November 3, 2015 |
Chief of Staff
Department of Canadian Heritage, Minister's Office |
July 2012 to July 2013 | July 15, 2013 |
Director of Communications
Department of Canadian Heritage, Minister's office |
December 2011 to July 2012 | July 9, 2012 |
Director of Parliamentary Affairs
Department of Canadian Heritage, Minister's office |
July 2009 to December 2011 | December 5, 2011 |
Director of Issues Management; Acting Chief of Staff
Natural Resources Canada, Minister's Office |
November 2008 to July 2009 | July 17, 2009 |
Senior Policy Advisor
Human Resources and Social Development Canada, Office of the Minister of State |
January 2007 to November 2008 | November 21, 2008 |