Teck is a diversified resource company committed to responsible mining and mineral development with major business units focused on copper, zinc and steelmaking coal. Headquartered in Vancouver, Canada, its shares are listed on the Toronto Stock Exchange under the symbols TCK.A and TCK.B and the New York Stock Exchange under the symbol TCK.
Jonathan Price, President & Chief Executive Officer
End date of the last completed financial year: 2023-12-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
CleanBC Industry Fund | $11,194,000.00 | Yes |
Employment and Social Development Canada (ESDC) | $750,000.00 | Yes |
Address:
Suite 3300, Bentall 5
550 Burrard Street
Vancouver, BC V6C 0B3
Canada
Telephone number:
604-699-4504
Teck Resources Limited is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Teck Resources Limited | 2024-04-01 | current |
Teck Resources Limited | 2010-08-09 | 2024-04-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Jonathan Price | 2022-09-30 | Current |
Donald Lindsay | 2010-08-09 | 2022-09-30 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Analyst
Public Safety Canada, National Security Policy Directorate |
2010 to 2012 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, Minister's Office |
October 2008 to January 2010 | January 19, 2010 |
Summer Student
Federal Court of Canada, Courts Administration Service |
2007 to 2007 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant
Fisheries and Oceans Canada, Minister's Office |
April 2002 to December 2003 | Not a designated office |
Manager
House of Commons, Office of the Member of Parliament for Thornhill |
October 2001 to March 2002 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
House of Commons, Office of the Member of Parliament for Kitchener Centre |
July 2000 to September 2021 | Not a designated office |
Special Assistant
House of Commons, Office of the Member of Parliament for Mississauga West |
September 1999 to July 2000 | Not a designated office |
Research Assistant
House of Commons, Office of the Member of Parliament for Oak Ridges |
May 1999 to September 1999 | Not a designated office |
Research Assistant
House of Commons, Office of the Member of Parliament for Oak Ridges |
May 1998 to September 1998 | Not a designated office |
Research Assistant
House of Commons, Office of the Member of Parliament for Oak Ridges |
May 1997 to September 1997 | Not a designated office |