Subject matters | Details | Categories |
---|---|---|
Defence, Industry
|
Assist in securing and managing defence and coast guard contracts under the National Shipbuilding Strategy (NSS) and other procurement opportunities.
|
Policies or Program
|
Immigration
|
Discussing possible change of policy regarding biometrics collection
|
Policies or Program
|
Government Procurement
|
Government Contract Pursued - ship repair and overhaul opportunities with the Government of Canada
|
Policies or Program
|
Vancouver Shipyards has forged a solid reputation for the design, construction, maintenance and repair of all types of vessels. Repair services are centered on a SyncoLift marine elevator of 1200 tonnes capacity. The yard's facilities include a major steel forming, a large fabrication and assembly hall and a 20,000 square foot, totally enclosed paint facility where entire vessels are sheltered for external painting. The yard also has the capability to drydock multiple vessels simultaneously.
John McCarthy, Chief Executive Officer
End date of the last completed financial year: 2023-12-31
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Government of British Columbia | $0.00 | Yes |
Address:
2 Pemberton Avenue
North Vancouver, BC V7P 2R2
Canada
Telephone number:
604-984-5122
Vancouver Shipyards Co. Ltd. does not have any subsidiaries that could have a direct interest in the outcome of the undertaking
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Vancouver Shipyards Co. Ltd. | 2024-05-10 | current |
Vancouver Shipyards Co. Ltd. | 2010-09-01 | 2024-05-10 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
John McCarthy | 2022-09-21 | Current |
Mark Lamarre | 2018-07-23 | 2022-09-21 |
Brian Carter | 2017-07-31 | 2018-07-23 |
Jonathan Whitworth | 2010-09-01 | 2017-07-31 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director, Global Aerospace, Defence & Security
Canadian Commercial Corporation, Business Development |
May 2010 to March 2018 | Not a designated office |
LCdr
DND, Materiel Group |
November 1984 to November 1988 | Not a designated office |
LCdr
DND, National Defence Operations Centre |
July 1981 to November 1984 | Not a designated office |
LCdr
DND, HMCS Ottawa |
August 1979 to July 1981 | Not a designated office |
Lt(N)
DND, Canadian Forces Fleet School Halifax |
June 1978 to August 1979 | Not a designated office |
Lt(N)
DND, Royal Roads Military College |
April 1976 to June 1978 | Not a designated office |
Lt(N)
DND, Maritime Forces Pacific |
June 1973 to April 1976 | Not a designated office |
SLt(N)
DND, Maritime Training Pacific |
May 1972 to June 1973 | Not a designated office |
OCdt
Department of National Defence, Royal Military College of Canada |
August 1968 to May 1972 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Assistant Secretary to the Treasury board
Treasury Board of Canada Secretariat, International Affairs, Security and Justice |
December 2017 to August 2022 | August 31, 2022 |
ADM
Global Affairs Canada, Public Affairs |
July 2017 to November 2017 | November 30, 2017 |
Deputy Head of Mission
Embassy of Canada to the USA, N/A |
September 2013 to July 2017 | July 31, 2017 |