Engineering services, particularly with respect submarine refitting and maintenance.
Mike Whalley, President
Address:
75 Albert Street, Suite 800
Ottawa, ON K1P 5E7
Canada
Telephone number:
613-567-2764
Ext.
2231
Fax number:
613-567-9083
CSMG Inc. dba Babcock Canada does not have any subsidiaries that could have a direct interest in the outcome of the undertaking
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
CSMG Inc. dba Babcock Canada | 2024-02-28 | current |
CSMG Inc. dba Babcock Canada | 2010-10-14 | 2024-02-28 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Jerry McLean | 2021-11-22 | Current |
Mike Whalley | 2017-05-01 | 2021-11-22 |
Mark Dixon | 2012-11-01 | 2017-05-01 |
Michel Bouchard | 2010-10-14 | 2011-06-02 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Chief of Staff
DND, Materiel Group |
July 2007 to August 2012 | August 8, 2012 |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director Professional Services Business Initiatives
PWGSC, Acquisitions |
June 2009 to November 2011 | Not a designated office |
Director Software Procurement
PWGSC, Acquisitions |
May 2008 to October 2008 | Not a designated office |
Manager Procurement
PWGSC, Acquisitions |
September 1986 to May 2008 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Capital Investment Advisor
DND, Royal Canadian Navy Capital Program Coordination |
July 2010 Footnote 3 | Not a designated office |