Engineering services, particularly with respect submarine refitting and maintenance.
Michel Bouchard, President
Address:
85 Albert Street, Suite 600
Ottawa, ON K1P 6A4
Canada
Telephone number:
613-567-2764
Fax number:
613-567-9083
CSMG Inc. dba Babcock Canada does not have any subsidiaries that could have a direct interest in the outcome of the undertaking
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
CSMG Inc. dba Babcock Canada | 2024-02-28 | current |
CSMG Inc. dba Babcock Canada | 2010-10-14 | 2024-02-28 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Jerry McLean | 2021-11-22 | Current |
Mike Whalley | 2017-05-01 | 2021-11-22 |
Mark Dixon | 2012-11-01 | 2017-05-01 |
Michel Bouchard | 2010-10-14 | 2011-06-02 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
DGMEPM/Director Maritime Class Management and PM TRUMP (Commander)
Department of National Defence, Navy |
1996 to 1998 | Not a designated office |
French Language Student (Commander)
Department of National Defence, Navy |
1995 to 1996 | Not a designated office |
Group Technical Officer, Second Maritime Operational Group, Esquimalt (Commander)
Department of National Defence, Navy |
1992 to 1995 | Not a designated office |
CO/CFMETR Nanoose Bay (Commander)
Department of National Defence, Navy |
1989 to 1992 | Not a designated office |
DGMEPM/DMCS 3/Project Manager CANTASS (Lt.-Commander)
Department of National Defence, Navy |
1984 to 1989 | Not a designated office |
Engineer (Sub.Lt.)
Department of National Defence, Navy |
1976 to 1983 | Not a designated office |
Officer-Cadet
Department of National Defence, Navy |
1972 to 1976 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
DGMEPM/DMSS 8 (Commander)
Department of National Defence, Navy |
1998 to 2001 | Not a designated office |
DGMEPM/DMCM HFX (Commander)
Department of National Defence, Navy |
1997 to 1998 | Not a designated office |
Naval Attache, Paris
Department of National Defence, Navy |
1994 to 1997 | Not a designated office |
CO FMG / MARLANT N45 (Commander)
Department of National Defence, Navy |
1992 to 1994 | Not a designated office |
Student (Commander)
Department of National Defence, Canadian Forces Staff College |
1991 to 1992 | Not a designated office |
Career Manager (Lt-Commander)
Department of National Defence, Navy |
1990 to 1991 | Not a designated office |
Engineering Officer HMCS Huron (Lt-Commander)
Department of National Defence, Navy |
1988 to 1990 | Not a designated office |
Engineer (Sub-Lieutenant)
Department of National Defence, Navy |
1980 to 1988 | Not a designated office |
Officer-Cadet
Department of National Defence, Royal Military College |
1976 to 1980 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
DGMEPM/Director Maritime Class Management and PM TRUMP (Commander)
Department of National Defence, Navy |
1996 to 1998 | Not a designated office |
French Language Student (Commander)
Department of National Defence, Navy |
1995 to 1996 | Not a designated office |
Group Technical Officer, Second Maritime Operational Group, Esquimalt (Commander)
Department of National Defence, Navy |
1992 to 1995 | Not a designated office |
CO/CFMETR Nanoose Bay (Commander)
Department of National Defence, Navy |
1989 to 1992 | Not a designated office |
DGMEPM/DMCS 3/Project Manager CANTASS (Lt.-Commander)
Department of National Defence, Navy |
1984 to 1989 | Not a designated office |
Engineer (Sub.Lt.)
Department of National Defence, Navy |
1976 to 1983 | Not a designated office |
Officer-Cadet
Department of National Defence, Navy |
1972 to 1976 | Not a designated office |