TekSavvy Solutions Inc. is an independent telecommunications services provider.
Marc Gaudrault, CEO
End date of the last completed financial year: 2019-09-30
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Innovation, Science and Economic Development Canada (ISED) | $73,291.12 | Yes |
Ontario Ministry of Advanced Education & Skills Development | $36,026.69 | Yes |
Ontario Ministry of Advanced Education & Skills Development | $71,539.70 | Yes |
Address:
800 Richmond Street
Chatham, ON N7M 5J5
Canada
Telephone number:
613-294-1457
Fax number:
519-360-1716
TekSavvy Solutions Inc. is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
TekSavvy Solutions Inc. | 2024-04-01 | current |
TekSavvy Solutions Inc. | 2011-02-08 | 2024-04-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Marc Gaudrault | 2011-11-10 | Current |
Roch Gaudrault | 2011-02-08 | 2011-10-02 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Advisor
Industry Canada, Digital Policy Branch/SITT |
October 2009 to March 2015 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Member of Parliament, Guelph |
2008 to 2010 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Advisor
Finance Canada, Financial Sector Policy Branch |
September 2013 to January 2015 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Advisor
Industry Canada, Digital Policy Branch/SITT |
October 2009 to March 2015 | Not a designated office |