TekSavvy Solutions Inc. is an independent telecommunications services provider.
Marc Gaudrault, CEO
End date of the last completed financial year: 2020-09-30
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Ontario Ministry of Advanced Education & Skills Development | $72,055.70 | Yes |
Address:
800 Richmond Street
Chatham, ON N7M 5J5
Canada
Telephone number:
613-294-1457
Fax number:
519-360-1716
TekSavvy Solutions Inc. is not a subsidiary of any other parent companies.
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
TekSavvy Solutions Inc. | 2024-04-01 | current |
TekSavvy Solutions Inc. | 2011-02-08 | 2024-04-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Marc Gaudrault | 2011-11-10 | Current |
Roch Gaudrault | 2011-02-08 | 2011-10-02 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legal Counsel
Canadian Radio-television and Telecommunications Commission, Legal Sector |
July 2007 to April 2020 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Member of Parliament, Guelph |
2008 to 2010 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legal Counsel
Canadian Radio-television and Telecommunications Commission, Legal Sector |
July 2007 to April 2020 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Advisor
Industry Canada, Digital Policy Branch/SITT |
October 2009 to March 2015 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Press Secretary
House of Commons, , Office of the NDP Parliamentary Leader |
February 2017 to January 2019 | Not a designated office |
Member's Assistant
House of Commons, Office of the MP for Edmonton-Strathcona |
November 2015 to February 2017 | Not a designated office |
Parliamentary Assistant
House of Commons, Office of the Member of Parliament for Manicougan |
April 2014 to October 2015 | Not a designated office |
Parliamentary Affairs and Policy Officer
Office of the Commissioner of Official Languages, Policy and Communications Division |
April 2013 to April 2014 | Not a designated office |
Ministerial Services Coordinator
Environment Canada, Meterological Service of Canada |
April 2012 to April 2012 | Not a designated office |
Project Coordinator
Treasury Board of Canada Secretariat, Office of the Chief Human Resources Officer |
May 2011 to August 2011 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Office of MP for Windsor-Tecumseh |
February 2015 to December 2019 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Office of MP for Hamilton East-Stoney Creek |
September 2009 to October 2015 | Not a designated office |
Member's Assistant
House of Commons, Office of MP for Hamilton Mountain |
September 2007 to September 2008 | Not a designated office |