Total Number of Communication Reports: 73
Monthly communication reports in the last 6 months: 0
Allstream Inc. is a leading competitor in the national business and wholesale markets; offering small, medium and large businesses and government organizations a portfolio of telecommunications solutions tailored to meet their needs. Allstream's main products are IP-based communications, unified communications, voice and data connectivity, and security services. Allstream operates an extensive national broadband fibre optic network that spans almost 30,000 kilometres, and provides international connections through strategic alliances and interconnection agreements with other international service providers.
Michael Strople, President
Address:
200 Wellington Street, 1ON14
Toronto, ON M5V 3G2
Canada
Telephone number:
416-644-9771
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Zayo Canada Inc./ | 2024-06-21 | current |
Zayo Canada Inc./ | 2016-05-16 | 2024-06-21 |
Allstream Inc. | 2012-01-01 | 2016-05-16 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Vanessa Hyjek | 2023-12-07 | Current |
Michael Strople | 2014-01-17 | 2023-12-07 |
Dean Prevost | 2012-01-01 | 2014-01-17 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Summer Student
Unemployment Insurance Commission, Unemployment Insurance Commission |
May 1975 to August 1975 | Not a designated office |
Summer student
Statistics Canada, Statistics Canada |
May 1974 to August 1974 | Not a designated office |
Summer student
Statistics Canada, Statistics Canada |
May 1973 to August 1973 | Not a designated office |