Total Number of Communication Reports: 79
Monthly communication reports in the last 6 months: 0
Founded in 1938, the Appraisal Institute of Canada (AIC) is the premier real property valuation association in Canada. The AIC’s national office is located in Ottawa, Ontario and works collaboratively with 10 affiliated provincial organizations. AIC grants the distinguished Accredited Appraiser Canadian Institute (AACI) and Canadian Residential Appraiser (CRA) designations to individuals across Canada and around the world. These designations recognize highly qualified individuals who have completed AIC's rigorous curriculum, experience and examination requirements.
KEITH LANCASTLE, Chief Executive Officer
Address:
200 Catherine Street
Suite 403
Ottawa, ON K2P 2K9
Canada
Telephone number:
613-234-6533
Ext.
222
Fax number:
613-234-7197
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Appraisal Institute of Canada/Institut canadien des evaluateurs | 2024-06-24 | current |
Appraisal Institute of Canada/Institut canadien des evaluateurs | 2012-04-01 | 2024-06-24 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Donna Dewar | 2023-11-01 | Current |
KEITH LANCASTLE | 2022-11-14 | 2023-11-01 |
Tami Hynes | 2022-07-04 | 2022-11-14 |
KEITH LANCASTLE | 2012-04-01 | 2022-07-04 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy, Infrastructure Advisor
Infrastructure Canada, Minister's Office |
July 2013 to December 2015 | December 4, 2015 |
Policy, Marine Advisor
Transport Canada, Minister's Office |
May 2011 to July 2013 | July 15, 2013 |
Chief of Staff, Policy, Communications and Parliamentary Affairs Advisor
Sport Canada, Minister's Office |
March 2009 to May 2011 | May 18, 2011 |
Administrative Assistant, Receptionist
Natural Resources Canada, Minister's Office |
January 2007 to March 2009 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy, Infrastructure Advisor
Infrastructure Canada, Minister's Office |
July 2013 to December 2015 | December 4, 2015 |
Policy, Marine Advisor
Transport Canada, Minister's Office |
May 2011 to July 2013 | July 15, 2013 |
Chief of Staff, Policy, Communications and Parliamentary Affairs Advisor
Sport Canada, Minister's Office |
March 2009 to May 2011 | May 18, 2011 |
Administrative Assistant, Receptionist
Natural Resources Canada, Minister's Office |
January 2007 to March 2009 | Not a designated office |