Subject matters | Details | Categories |
---|---|---|
Research and Development, Science and Technology
|
Activities related to the operation of U15 digital initiatives including Cognit.ca and SecureScholar.
|
Grant, Contribution or Other Financial Benefit
|
Budget, International Relations, National Security/Security, Research and Development, Science and Technology
|
Advancing Canada’s research and development agenda, including funding, program design, and regulatory concerns related to research, including research security.
|
Policies or Program, Regulation
|
Education, Employment and Training, Research and Development, Science and Technology
|
Government of Canada Training and Employment policies with respect to the role of the Post Secondary Education (PSE) sector.
|
Policies or Program
|
Education, Housing
|
Housing strategy issues related to Post Secondary Education (PSE) and international students.
|
Policies or Program, Regulation
|
Education, Immigration, International Relations, Research and Development
|
Immigration issues related to international students, faculty, and highly qualified research personnel.
|
Policies or Program, Regulation
|
U15 Canada has three pillars of activity: • Convening our members; • Advocacy; and • Stewardship of the Research Ecosystem. In convening, advocacy and stewardship, U15 Canada engages with federal policy and program makers, collaborates with Universities Canada and other domestic organizations, and participates in the Global Network of Research-Intensive University Organizations.
Chad Gaffield, Chief Executive Officer
End date of the last completed financial year: 2024-04-30
Government Institution | Funding Received in Last Financial Year | Funding Expected in Current Financial Year |
---|---|---|
Canada Foundation for Innovation | $50,000.00 | No |
Canadian Institutes of Health Research (CIHR) | $25,000.00 | Yes |
Natural Sciences and Engineering Research Council (NSERC) | $25,000.00 | Yes |
Social Sciences and Humanities Research Council (SSHRC) | $25,000.00 | Yes |
Address:
360 Albert Street
Suite 1425
Ottawa, ON K1R 7X7
Canada
Telephone number:
613-695-5155
Fax number:
613-695-7955
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
U15-Group of Canadian Research Universities/U15-Regroupement des universités de recherche du Canada | 2024-04-30 | current |
U15-Group of Canadian Research Universities/U15-Regroupement des universités de recherche du Canada | 2012-05-01 | 2024-04-30 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Chad Gaffield | 2022-04-15 | Current |
Gilles Patry | 2017-10-01 | 2022-04-15 |
Suzanne Corbeil | 2012-05-01 | 2017-10-01 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Taylor Bachrach |
November 2019 to September 2022 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Nathan Cullen |
June 2018 to October 2019 | Not a designated office |
Parliamentary Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Don Davies |
February 2018 to June 2018 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Taylor Bachrach |
November 2019 to September 2022 | Not a designated office |
Legislative Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Nathan Cullen |
June 2018 to October 2019 | Not a designated office |
Parliamentary Assistant
House of Commons, Office of Don Davies |
February 2018 to June 2018 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
President and CEO
Social Sciences and Humanities Research Council of Canada, President's Office |
September 2006 to August 2014 | August 31, 2014 |