Rio Tinto is a leading international mining group headquartered in the UK, combining Rio Tinto plc, a London and New York Stock Exchange listed company, and Rio Tinto Limited, which is listed on the Australian Securities Exchange. Rio Tinto's business is finding, mining, and processing mineral resources. Major products are aluminium, copper, diamonds, thermal and metallurgical coal, uranium, gold, industrial minerals (borax, titanium dioxide and salt) and iron ore. Activities span the world and are strongly represented in Australia and North America with significant businesses in Asia, Europe, Africa and South America.
CAROLYN CHISHOLM, President
Address:
400-1190 Avenue des Canadiens-de-Montréal
Montreal, QC H3B 0E3
Canada
Telephone number:
613-292-7473
Fax number:
613-569-6195
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Rio Tinto Canada Management Inc | 2024-04-15 | current |
Rio Tinto Canada Management Inc | 2012-08-22 | 2024-04-15 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
CAROLYN CHISHOLM | 2020-10-09 | Current |
BLAIR DICKERSON | 2015-05-04 | 2020-10-09 |
CAROLYN CHISHOLM | 2015-03-06 | 2015-05-04 |
Virginia Flood | 2012-08-22 | 2015-03-06 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Policy Advisor
Senate of Canada, Leader of the Government |
September 1997 to December 1999 | Not a designated office |
Policy Analyst
House of Commons, Liberal Reserach Bureau |
September 1994 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Contract Worker
Royal Commission on Aboriginal Peoples, N/A |
June 1994 to June 1994 | Not a designated office |
Co-Op Student
Aboriginal Affairs and Northern Development, Specific Claims Division |
September 1992 to December 1992 | Not a designated office |
Co-Op Student
Canadian Intergovernment Conference Secretariat, Canadian Intergovernment Conference Secretariat |
May 1992 to August 1992 | Not a designated office |
Student
House of Commons, Office of Francis Leblanc, MP |
May 1989 to August 1989 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Senior Policy Advisor
Senate of Canada, Leader of the Government |
September 1997 to December 1999 | Not a designated office |
Policy Analyst
House of Commons, Liberal Reserach Bureau |
September 1994 to October 1996 | Not a designated office |
Contract Worker
Royal Commission on Aboriginal Peoples, N/A |
June 1994 to June 1994 | Not a designated office |
Co-Op Student
Aboriginal Affairs and Northern Development, Specific Claims Division |
September 1992 to December 1992 | Not a designated office |
Co-Op Student
Canadian Intergovernment Conference Secretariat, Canadian Intergovernment Conference Secretariat |
May 1992 to August 1992 | Not a designated office |
Student
House of Commons, Office of Francis Leblanc, MP |
May 1989 to August 1989 | Not a designated office |